Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. United States Secret Service
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv08003
Date Filed2017-10-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Naomi Reice Buchwald
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffNicholas Confessore
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Nicholas Confessore submitted a FOIA request to the U. S. Secret Service for records concerning visitors' logs for the office of the Presidential Transition Team. The agency denied the request, telling the New York Times that the records were not subject to FOIA, but were instead subject to the Presidential Records Act. The New York Times filed an administrative appeal of that decision. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Secret Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-171COMPLAINT against United States Secret Service. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14254900)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Nicholas Confessore.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-172CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-173FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) Modified on 10/18/2017 (lb). (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-174REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Secret Service, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Nicholas Confessore, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
2017-10-18CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (vf) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-18Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (vf) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-18Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-185ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Secret Service. (vf) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-18***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney David Edward McCraw to RE-FILE Document 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-186RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Grupo Financiero Inbursa, S.A.B. de C.V. for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-18NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-11-177NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Casey Kyung-Se Lee on behalf of United States Secret Service. (Lee, Casey) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff