Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02156
Date Filed2017-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY
Case DescriptionThe Campaign for Accountability submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Treasury for records concerning whether Trump administration officials had tried to influence the agency in connection with its dispute with Renaissance Technologies or its co-Chief Executive Officer Robert Mercer over the use of basket option contracts. CFA also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and one office contacted CFA for clarification. CFA claimed the agency was unwilling to work with it to narrow the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CFA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-181COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5164659) filed by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons U.S. Department of the Treasury, # 6 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 7 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Fineman, Steven) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-202NOTICE of Errata by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(Fastiff, Eric) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-203NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Fastiff on behalf of CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Fastiff, Eric) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-20Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (md) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-204SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-255MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael J. Miarmi, :Firm- Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP, :Address- 250 Hudson Street, 8th Floor, New York, NY 10013-1413. Phone No. - (212) 355-9500. Fax No. - (212) 355-9592 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5176178. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Miarmi, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fastiff, Eric) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-11-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 10/26/2017 (Fastiff, Eric) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/26/2017. (Fastiff, Eric) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-148RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/26/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/25/2017. (Fastiff, Eric) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-22MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Michael J. Miarmi is admitted to represent Plaintiff Pro Hac Vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/22/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-249NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 11/24/2017)
2017-11-2410Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 11/24/2017)
2017-11-27MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before December 7, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/27/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/7/2017. (tj) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-12-0711ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-07MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before December 21, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/7/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-2112PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Fastiff, Eric) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties Joint Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall, from the date of this Order, submit a joint status report every 90 days describing Defendant's efforts and progress in producing responsive records subject to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/22/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-03-2213Joint STATUS REPORT by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Miarmi, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-23MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before April 6, 2018, the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule for partial motions for summary judgment on the disagreements identified in 13 the parties' Joint Status Report. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/23/2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/6/2018 (tj) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-04-0614Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-06-2015Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-09-1816Joint STATUS REPORT by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Miarmi, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-21MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status hearing on October 9, 2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 21, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-25Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/9/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-09Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 10/9/2018. Parties advise the court of the status of this action. Next Status Report due by 11/9/2018. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro Miller.) (tj) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-11-0917Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 9, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar