Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02177
Date Filed2017-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-191COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE( Filing fee received $ 400 receipt number 4616088012) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit)(Burday, Joshua) Modified on 11/7/2017 (sth). (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-19Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sth) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-062STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/06/17. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-063SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(sth) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06SUMMONS Not Issued as to the U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney. (sth) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff