Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleImmigrant Legal Resource Center v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2017cv06029
Date Filed2017-10-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffImmigrant Legal Resource Center
Case DescriptionThe Immigrant Legal Resource Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning its policies on sanctuary cities. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After the agency failed to respond, ILRC filed an administrative appeal of the delay. ICE remanded the appeal, telling ILRC that its request was in the queue for processing. ILRC then filed suit. This appears to be identical to 3:17-cv-6029.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-201COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11816257.). Filed byImmigrant Legal Resource Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Callcott, W.) (Filed on 10/20/2017) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-202Proposed Summons. (Callcott, W.) (Filed on 10/20/2017) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-203Certificate of Interested Entities by Immigrant Legal Resource Center (Callcott, W.) (Filed on 10/20/2017) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-204NOTICE by Immigrant Legal Resource Center Corporate Disclosure Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 71 (Callcott, W.) (Filed on 10/20/2017) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-235Case assigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-236Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2018 02:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-237Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-238CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong on 10/23/17. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-11-219CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Immigrant Legal Resource Center re 3 Certificate of Interested Entities, 4 Notice (Other), 1 Complaint, 7 Summons Issued as to USA, 2 Proposed Summons, 8 Order, 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Callcott, W.) (Filed on 11/21/2017) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-2110SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Immigrant Legal Resource Center. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Mail Certification)(Callcott, W.) (Filed on 11/21/2017) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-2411ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (Pereda, David) (Filed on 11/24/2017) (Entered: 11/24/2017)
2018-01-1012STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Immigrant Legal Resource Center Joint Request For Relief From Automatic Referral To ADR Multi-Option Program; Proposed Order filed by Immigrant Legal Resource Center. (Callcott, W.) (Filed on 1/10/2018) Modified on 1/11/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-1013ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Callcott, W.) (Filed on 1/10/2018) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-1014Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting 12 Stipulation for Relief from Automatic Referral to ADR Multi-Option Program.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-2415JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Immigrant Legal Resource Center. (Callcott, W.) (Filed on 1/24/2018) Modified on 1/25/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-3016CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified that the Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2018 is continued to 2/1/2018 at 2:30 pm. Call-in instructions are contained in Entry 8 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2018 02:30 PM. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-02-0117Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/1/2018. Consent/Declination due by 2/5/2018.Court Reporter: Not Reported. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/1/2018) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-0518CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (Pereda, David) (Filed on 2/5/2018) Modified on 2/6/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-0519ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DONNA M. RYU FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/5/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-0620ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for all further proceedings. Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/6/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-1321CLERK'S NOTICE: Parties are hereby notified that an Initial Case Management Conference has been set on 3/21/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu in Courtroom No. 4, Third Floor, U.S. District Court, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. The joint case management conference statement is due on 3/14/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-03-0122Notice of Unavailability of Counsel by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (Pereda, David) (Filed on 3/1/2018) Modified on 3/2/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-0223STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER on Request to Postpone Date of Case Management Conference filed by Immigrant Legal Resource Center, United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Callcott, W.) (Filed on 3/2/2018) Modified on 3/5/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-0524ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 23 Stipulation to continue Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2018. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 4/18/2018 01:30 PM. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-04-1025SECOND JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & Proposed Order filed by Immigrant Legal Resource Center, United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement, and United States Department of Homeland Security. (Callcott, W.) (Filed on 4/10/2018) Modified on 4/11/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/11/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-1226CLERK'S NOTICE: The court has reviewed the second joint case management statement [Docket 25]. It is unclear whether the parties are asking that the 4/18/2018 01:30 PM Initial Case Management Conference be continued for 120 days, or whether the parties want the court to hold the 4/18/2018 Initial Case Management Conference, and set a further case management conference at that time. [See Docket 25 at page 6: lines 13-18]. If either party would like to go forward with the 4/18/2018 Initial Case Management Conference, counsel for that party should notify Ivy Garcia (510-637-3639) by noon on 4/16/2018. If no call is received, the 4/18/2018 01:30 PM Initial Case Management Conference will be vacated and continued to 8/15/2018 01:30, with an updated joint case management statement due on 8/8/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-1827Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/18/2018. The parties reported that they continue to engage in meet-and-confer discussions to resolve or narrow disputed issues. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2018 01:30 PM. FTR Time: 2:01-2:04. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2018) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-08-0828JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Homeland Security., Immigrant Legal Resource Center, and United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (Pereda, David) (Filed on 8/8/2018) Modified on 8/9/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-1529PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/15/2018 1:54:41 PM ]. File Size [ 6224 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:12:58 ]. (courtspeak). (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-1530Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/15/2018. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2018 01:30 PM. FTR Time: 1:54-2:07. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/15/2018) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-10-2431STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order filed by Immigrant Legal Resource Center, United States Immigration & Customs Enforcement, and United Department of Homeland Security. (Callcott, W.) (Filed on 10/24/2018) Modified on 10/25/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-2532Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 31 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2019 01:30 PM.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar