Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02224
Date Filed2017-10-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildlife Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Surface Mining for records related to the March 22, 2017 Notice of Intent to Initiate Public Scoping and Prepare an Environmental Impact Statement for the San Juan Mine Deep Lease Extension Mining Plan Modification. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Wildlife Guardians that its request would be put in the complex queue. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wildlife Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-261COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5177678) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Nokes, Kelly) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/27/2017) (jd). Modified to replace fillable civil cover sheet on 10/27/2017 (jd). (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-262Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-26Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (jd) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff