Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Title County of Mille Lacs v. United States Department of Justice et al
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2017cv04863
Date Filed2017-10-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael J. Davis
PlaintiffCounty of Mille Lacs
Case DescriptionThe County of Mille Lacs submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Department of the Interior for records concerning agreements between the agencies and the Mille Lacs Band of Ojibwe regarding concurrent federal criminal jurisdiction under the Tribal Law Enforcement Act. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from either agency, the County of Mille Lacs filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantUnited States Department of Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-261COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-5785369) filed by County of Mille Lacs. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Randy) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-262TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil 5th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 17-cv-04863(MJD/LIB). (las) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-263Summons Issued as to United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Justice. (las) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-11-014DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR/Summons Issued as to County of Mille Lacs. (las) Modified on 11/1/2017 (las). (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-025NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Marentette on behalf of United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Justice. (Marentette, Pamela) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff