Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCouncil on American-Islamic Relations-CA et al v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2017cv07887
Date Filed2017-10-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Philip S. Gutierrez
PlaintiffCouncil on American-Islamic Relations-CA
PlaintiffVigilant Love Coalition
PlaintiffAsian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Southern California
Case DescriptionThe Council on American Islamic Relations and three other organizations submitted FOIA requests to the Federal Emergency Management Agency, the Department of Homeland Security, and the Department of Justice for records concerning the Countering Violent Extremism program. The plaintiffs also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request, but after none of them responded, the Council on American Islamic Relations and the other three organizations filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Emergency Management Agency
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security Long Beach Field Office
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security Los Angeles Field Office
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation Los Angeles Field Office
DefendantUnited States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantUnited States Department Of Justice Civil Rights Division
DefendantUnited States Department Of Justice Community Oriented Policing Services
DefendantUnited States Department Of Justice Community Relations Service
DefendantUnited States Department Of Justice Executive Office For The United States Attorneys
DefendantUnited States Department Of Justice Office Of Justice Programs
DefendantUnited States Department Of Justice Office Of The Attorney General
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice National Security Division
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-271COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20736423 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Vigilant Love Coalition, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA. (Attorney Anjan Choudhury added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California(pty:pla), Attorney Anjan Choudhury added to party Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles(pty:pla), Attorney Anjan Choudhury added to party Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA(pty:pla), Attorney Anjan Choudhury added to party Vigilant Love Coalition(pty:pla))(Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-272CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Vigilant Love Coalition. (Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-273Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Vigilant Love Coalition. (Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-274Plaintiff's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-305Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A Kim counsel for Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Vigilant Love Coalition. Adding Elizabeth A. Kim as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth A. Kim. (Attorney Elizabeth A Kim added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth A Kim added to party Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth A Kim added to party Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth A Kim added to party Vigilant Love Coalition(pty:pla))(Kim, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-306NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-307NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-308NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-309Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Vigilant Love Coalition. (Kim, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-3110STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-10-311121 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation Los Angeles Field Office, Federal Emergency Management Agency, United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security Long Beach Field Office, United States Department of Homeland Security Los Angeles Field Office. (bm) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-2212FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants United States Department of Justice, United States Department Of Justice Civil Rights Division, United States Department Of Justice Community Oriented Policing Services, United States Department Of Justice Community Relations Service, United States Department Of Justice Executive Office For The United States Attorneys, United States Department Of Justice Office Of Justice Programs, United States Department Of Justice Office Of The Attorney General, Federal Bureau of Investigation amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 , filed by Plaintiffs Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Vigilant Love Coalition, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA(Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-2213AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Vigilant Love Coalition. (Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-2214Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 13 , Amended Complaint/Petition,,, 12 filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Vigilant Love Coalition. (Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-2215Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Vigilant Love Coalition, (Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-271621 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint 12 as to Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Bureau of Investigation Los Angeles Field Office, Federal Emergency Management Agency, United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California, United States Department Of Justice Civil Rights Division, United States Department Of Justice Community Oriented Policing Services, United States Department Of Justice Community Relations Service, United States Department Of Justice Executive Office For The United States Attorneys, United States Department Of Justice Office Of Justice Programs, United States Department Of Justice Office Of The Attorney General, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security Long Beach Field Office, United States Department of Homeland Security Los Angeles Field Office, United States Department of Justice. (bm) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-12-2817PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Vigilant Love Coalition, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Emily Sase, DOJ. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase, DOJ. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Emily Sase, DOJ. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. [Summons and Amended Complaint served per F.R.C.P. 4(i)(A), (B)] (Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
2018-01-1818STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Department of Homeland Security Long Beach Field Office answer now due 2/16/2018; United States Department Of Justice Office Of The Attorney General answer now due 2/16/2018; Federal Bureau of Investigation answer now due 2/16/2018; United States Department Of Justice Civil Rights Division answer now due 2/16/2018; United States Department Of Justice Community Relations Service answer now due 2/16/2018; United States Department of Homeland Security answer now due 2/16/2018; United States Department Of Justice Executive Office For The United States Attorneys answer now due 2/16/2018; United States Department Of Justice Community Oriented Policing Services answer now due 2/16/2018; Federal Bureau of Investigation Los Angeles Field Office answer now due 2/16/2018; United States Department of Homeland Security Los Angeles Field Office answer now due 2/16/2018; United States Department of Justice answer now due 2/16/2018; United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California answer now due 2/16/2018; United States Department Of Justice Office Of Justice Programs answer now due 2/16/2018; Federal Emergency Management Agency answer now due 2/16/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security Long Beach Field Office; United States Department Of Justice Office Of The Attorney General; Federal Bureau of Investigation; United States Department Of Justice Civil Rights Division; United States Department Of Justice Community Relations Service; United States Department of Homeland Security; United States Department Of Justice Executive Office For The United States Attorneys; United States Department Of Justice Community Oriented Policing Services ; Federal Bureau of Investigation Los Angeles Field Office; United States Department of Homeland Security Los Angeles Field Office; United States Department of Justice; United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California; United States Department Of Justice Office Of Justice Programs; Federal Emergency Management Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation Los Angeles Field Office(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Federal Emergency Management Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department Of Justice Civil Rights Division(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department Of Justice Community Oriented Policing Services (pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department Of Justice Community Relations Service(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department Of Justice Executive Office For The United States Attorneys(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department Of Justice Office Of Justice Programs(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department Of Justice Office Of The Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department of Homeland Security Long Beach Field Office(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department of Homeland Security Los Angeles Field Office(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department of Justice(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
2018-01-2219ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 18 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. IT IS SO ORDERED that the Defendants, Federal Emergency Management Agency, United States Department Of Homeland Security, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Attorneys Office For The Central District Of California, and United States Department Of Justice (Defendants), shall have to and including February 16, 2018, within which to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. (ab) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-02-1520STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint and Response filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Vigilant Love Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-2121ORDER SETTING DEADLINES TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSE 20 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Per the parties' February 15, 2018 stipulation, Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint no later than March 2, 2018. Defendants shall respond within thirty (30) days of the filing of the Second Amended Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (ab) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-03-0222Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition,,, 12 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 , filed by Plaintiffs Vigilant Love Coalition, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California(Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-0223SECOND AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Vigilant Love Coalition. (Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-0224Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 23 , Amended Complaint/Petition, 22 filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Vigilant Love Coalition. (Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-0225Second Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Vigilant Love Coalition, (Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-052660 DAY Summons Issued re Second Amended Complaint/Petition, 22 as to Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Bureau of Investigation Los Angeles Field Office, Federal Emergency Management Agency, United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California, United States Department Of Justice Civil Rights Division, United States Department Of Justice Community Oriented Policing Services, United States Department Of Justice Community Relations Service, United States Department Of Justice Executive Office For The United States Attorneys, United States Department Of Justice Office Of Justice Programs, United States Department Of Justice Office Of The Attorney General, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security Long Beach Field Office, United States Department of Homeland Security Los Angeles Field Office, United States Department of Justice, United States Department of Justice National Security Division. (bm) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-1627PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Vigilant Love Coalition, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Emily Sase, DOJ. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase, DOJ. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Emily Sase, DOJ. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 POS by Email Based on Agreement of Existing Parties, # 2 Original Summons)(Kim, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-2928Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 04/09/2018 re Amended Complaint/Petition, 22 filed by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Bureau of Investigation Los Angeles Field Office, Federal Emergency Management Agency, United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California, United States Department Of Justice Civil Rights Division, United States Department Of Justice Community Oriented Policing Services, United States Department Of Justice Community Relations Service, United States Department Of Justice Executive Office For The United States Attorneys, United States Department Of Justice Office Of Justice Programs, United States Department Of Justice Office Of The Attorney General, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security Long Beach Field Office, United States Department of Homeland Security Los Angeles Field Office, United States Department of Justice, United States Department of Justice National Security Division. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department of Justice National Security Division(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-0229ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THEFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer 28 , by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS SO ORDERED that the Defendants, Federal Emergency Management Agency, United States Department Of Homeland Security, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Attorneys Office For The Central District Of California, United States Department Of Justice, and the various sub-agencies named in the Second Amended Complaint ("Defendants"), shall have to and including April 9, 2018, within which to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. (bm) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-0930ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, 22 filed by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Bureau of Investigation Los Angeles Field Office, Federal Emergency Management Agency, United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California, United States Department Of Justice Civil Rights Division, United States Department Of Justice Community Oriented Policing Services, United States Department Of Justice Community Relations Service, United States Department Of Justice Executive Office For The United States Attorneys, United States Department Of Justice Office Of Justice Programs, United States Department Of Justice Office Of The Attorney General, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security Long Beach Field Office, United States Department of Homeland Security Los Angeles Field Office, United States Department of Justice, United States Department of Justice National Security Division.(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-1131ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2018 at 02:00 PM. (wm) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-07-1632JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiffs American Civil Liberties Union of Southern California, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Los Angeles, Council on American-Islamic Relations-CA, Vigilant Love Coalition.. (Choudhury, Anjan) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-2333MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Case called. Counsel makes appearances. Court and counsel confer regarding status of the case. In light of the above scheduled hearing, and having heard from the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS the government to e-file by no later than February 1, 2019, the production of documents. Court sets a status conference for March 4, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. The parties to e-file a joint status conference one week prior to the status conference set, no later than February 25, 2019. Counsel to meet and confer to resolve all issues discussed in open Court prior to e-filing documents. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (bm) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar