Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02237
Date Filed2017-10-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wild Horse Freedom Federation submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for weekly reports in connection with the Wild Horse and Burro Program from January 2016 to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked for clarification, which was provided by the Federation. The Federation asked the agency to provide an estimated completion date, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Wild Horse Freedom Federation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [12]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-301COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5180600) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-30Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-213NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-12-064NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-075ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-07MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by December 21, 2017. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/07/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/21/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-206Joint STATUS REPORT by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-21MINUTE ORDER: As proposed in the 6 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that a further such report shall be filed by March 8, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/21/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/8/201. (nbn) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-03-087Joint STATUS REPORT by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-23MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due April 16, 2018; Plaintiff's Opposition and Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due May 21, 2018; Defendant's Reply shall be due June 4, 2018; and Plaintiff's Reply shall be due June 18, 2018. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before September 17, 2018. The Court apologizes for the inadvertent delay. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/23/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 4/16/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/21/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/4/2018. Replies due by 6/18/2018. Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-04-168MOTION for Summary Judgment by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration Ryan Witt, # 4 Exhibit Vaughn Index, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-05-219MOTION for Summary Judgment by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 12)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2110Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-06-29MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiff's suggestion, the Court ORDERS that, by July 6, 2018, Defendant shall produce for in camera inspection clean and redacted copies of Exhibits 11 and 12 referenced on page 14 of Plaintiff's 9 Memorandum. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/29/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: In-Camera Submission due by 7/6/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-1811ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant's 8 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall conduct a new search and release to Plaintiff the three unredacted pages from Exhibit 11 and that the parties shall submit a new proposed joint briefing schedule on or before August 1, 2018. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/18/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-1812MEMORANDUM OPINION re 11 Order on Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/18/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/1/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-08-0113Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-02MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 13 Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by September 4, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/2/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-1014NOTICE to the Court by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT re 12 Memorandum & Opinion (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar