Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02239
Date Filed2017-10-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning Instruction Memorandum No. 2014-122. The Center submitted a second FOIA request to BLM for records concerning the Cadiz Valley Water Conservation Recovery and Storage Project. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Food Safety filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-301COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5181326) filed by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Bureau of Land Management, # 3 Summons US Attorney, # 4 Summons Attorney General)(Wu, Sylvia) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-302Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Wu, Sylvia) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-303MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adam Keats, :Firm- Center for Food Safety, :Address- 303 Sacramento St., 2nd Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-826-2770. Fax No. - 415-826-0507 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5181382. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam Keats, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wu, Sylvia) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-11-01Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-03SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, US Attorney, and US Attorney General.....INCORRECT SUMMONS FILED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED. (zsb) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-064NOTICE OF CORRECTED SUMMONS by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Wu, Sylvia) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-065SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-13MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam Keats. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/13/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 11/14/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/14/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/14/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/14/2017.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wu, Sylvia) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-12-147Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-158ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-15ORDER GRANTING Consent 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond on or before December 15, 2017. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/15/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by January 3, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/15/2017. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Attorney Meet and Confer Conference and Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/3/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2018-01-039PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Keats, Adam) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-0410MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kellan Smith, :Firm- Center for Food Safety, :Address- 303 Sacramento Street, 2nd Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - (415) 826-2770. Fax No. - (415) 826-0507 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5274206. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Keats, Adam) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-05MINUTE ORDER: A status hearing in this case shall be set for January 10, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 25. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 01/05/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-05NOTICE OF ERROR re 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; emailed to akeats@centerforfoodsafety.org, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. In future, ECF login must match attorney signature on document. (znmw, ) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-05Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-0511MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Keats, Adam) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-05MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kellan Smith. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 01/05/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-05MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. At the request of counsel, the Court ORDERS that counsel for Plaintiff may appear by telephone for the status conference set for January 10, 2018. The status conference is additionally RESET for January 10, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 01/05/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-05Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/10/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-10Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 1/10/2018. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (nbn) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-10MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) By January 31, 2018, Defendant shall provide Plaintiff a description of the search it has conducted; 2) By February 28, 2018, Defendant shall make a significant release of the 3,000 documents it has located; and 3) By March 2, 2018, the parties shall submit a joint status report with a proposed schedule for further proceedings in the case. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 01/10/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-3112Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant's Search Declaration on Plaintiff by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-01MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Search Declaration. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall serve its search declaration on Plaintiff on or before February 5, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/1/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall serve its search declaration on Plaintiff by 2/5/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-03-0213Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-02MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a joint status report and proposed schedule on or before March 15, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/2/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Schedule and Status Report due by 3/15/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-1514Joint STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Wu, Sylvia) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-15MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 14 Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further joint status report and proposed schedule for further proceedings and the timeline of production on or before April 15, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/15/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-04-1615Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status and Proposed Schedule by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-17MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a further status report and timeline forproduction by April 20, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/17/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/20/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-2016Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule for Further Proceedings and Timeline of Production by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-20MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that: (1) On or before April 30, 2018, Defendant will complete its search and production as to all documents subject to the Plaintiff's FOIA requests from January 1, 2017, to present; (2) On or before May 31, 2018, Defendant will complete its collection process for all documents subject to the Plaintiff's FOIA requests from January 1, 2010, to January 1, 2017; (3) On or before May 31, 2018, Defendant will make a first production of documents subject to Plaintiff's FOIA requests for documents from January 1, 2010, to January 1, 2017; (4) On or before May 31, 2018, Defendant will provide an overall completion date for the production of all documents subject to the Plaintiff's FOIA requests for documents from January 1, 2010, to January 1, 2017, and; (5) On or before June 15, 2018, the parties will file another joint status report detailing any issues that remain to be resolved in this case. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/20/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-06-0417NOTICE of Appearance by George A. Kimbrell on behalf of CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-0518NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. Attorney Sylvia Shih-Yau Wu terminated. (Wu, Sylvia) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-1519Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint Status Report by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-15MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report on or before July 1, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/15/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/1/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-2920Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-02MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant will review no less than 1,000 pages a month of documents from January 1, 2010, to January 1, 2017, and complete its review and production of documents from this timeframe no later than June 14, 2020; and (2) On or before September 1, 2018, the parties will file another joint status report and proposed schedule for further proceedings detailing any issues that remain to be resolved in this case. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/2/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-09-0421Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-04MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant will continue to review no less than 1,000 pages a month of documents from January 1, 2010, to January 1, 2017, and complete its review and production of documents from this timeframe no later than June 14, 2020; and 2) On or before November 1, 2018, the parties shall file another joint status report and proposed schedule for further proceedings detailing any issues that remain to be resolved in this case. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/4/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-11-0122Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 22 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by January 1, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/2/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/1/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar