Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02250
Date Filed2017-10-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Treasury for records concerning listening sessions on tax reform held by officials at the agency. The Democracy Forward Foundation also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Democracy Forward Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
TREASURY DEPARTMENT
1500 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Washington, DC 20220
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-10-311COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against TREASURY DEPARTMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5183855), CIVIL COVER SHEET by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION, REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-012MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Josephine T. Morse, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- 1333 H Street NW Washington DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 448-9090. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5186255. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josephine T. Morse)(Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-063NOTICE of Errata by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION re 1 Complaint,, Cover Sheet,, Request for Summons to Issue, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Complaint)(Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-06Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-064SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-07MINUTE ORDER: Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Josephine Thacher Morse is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/7/17. (DJS) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-305NOTICE of Proof of Service by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION re 1 Complaint,, Cover Sheet,, Request for Summons to Issue, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Deborah Won)(Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-306RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 11/13/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/13/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/13/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/13/2017.) (See Docket Entry 5 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-137NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-138ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Sroka, Scott) Modified to add link on 12/14/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-13MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 1/19/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/13/17. (DJS) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2018. (tb) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2018-01-199Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-22MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 9 it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint status report AND A PROPOSED ORDER by February 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/22/18. (DJS) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2018. (tb) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-2610NOTICE of Errata by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Errata Letter to Clerk of Court)(Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-02-2011Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-26MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Report 11 , it is hereby ordered that Defendant shall make its first production of documents to Plaintiff no later than February 28, 2018, and that additional productions shall follow on a rolling basis every 30 days thereafter until production is complete. The Parties shall file a joint status report and proposed order by April 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/26/18. (DJS) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2018. (tb) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-04-1612NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Adam Anderson Grogg on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION Substituting for attorney Skye L. Perryman (Grogg, Adam) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-3013NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine T. Morse on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-3014Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-03MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joints status report 14 it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report by July 13, 2018 and every sixty days thereafter. To the extent the report contains a proposed briefing schedule the parties shall include a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/3/18. (DJS) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/13/2018. (tb) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-07-1215Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-09-1116Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-11-1317Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar