Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRutigliano v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityCentral Islip
Case Number2:2017cv06360
Date Filed2017-11-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Arthur D. Spatt
PlaintiffJoseph Rutigliano
Case DescriptionJoseph Rutiglianio, a former railroad conductor convicted of defrauding the U.S. Railroad Retirement Board, submitted several FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records about his conviction. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Rutiglianio filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-012Civil Cover Sheet.. by joseph rutigliano (Ryan, Joseph) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-013Proposed Summons. by joseph rutigliano (Ryan, Joseph) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-014Proposed Summons. by joseph rutigliano (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons) (Ryan, Joseph) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-011COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Joseph Rutigliano. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Rodin, Deanna) Modified document number on 11/2/2017 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-01FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0207-9948239 (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-02Incorrect Document Entry Information. Parties were added to the case incorrectly and complaint was enter as against plaintiff; parties were deleted and re-entered; then document entry #1 was deleted and re-entered against corrected defendant. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-025This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-02Case Assigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-026In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-027Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons Acting United States Attorney, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General) (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff