Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02349
Date Filed2017-11-07
Date Closed2018-03-09
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wild Horse Freedom Federation submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the two most recent agreements between the agency and the Mustang Heritage Foundation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency subsequently contacted the Federation and assigned a new tracking number to its request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Wild Horse Freedom Federation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-071COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5194900) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons )(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-082NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J. E. English on behalf of WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION (English, Alexander) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2017-11-09Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-12-064NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-115NOTICE of Appearance by C. Peter Sorenson on behalf of WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-126ANSWER to 1 Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Campbell, Rhonda) Modified to add link on 12/13/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-21MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 1/11/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/21/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2018-01-117Joint STATUS REPORT AND DISCLOSURE SCHEDULE by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-12MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties should file a further Joint Status Report on or before 2/19/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/12/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-02-198Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/19/2018)
2018-02-21MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations made in the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file either a stipulation of dismissal or further joint status report and proposed schedule for further proceedings, on or before 3/22/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/21/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-079STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff