Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02357
Date Filed2017-11-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records of communications sent to or from the Office of the Attorney General and Deputy Attorney General pertaining to an immigration parole for Russian national Natalia Veselnitskaya. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-081COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5197458) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Department of Justice)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2017-11-082LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2017-11-08Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-144STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/14/17. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-12-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/20/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/20/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff