Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE v. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02363
Date Filed2017-11-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffGIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Case DescriptionThe Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records concerning the extent to which the Washington gun lobby has tried to influence the way in which the agency carries out its statutory duties. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantBUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
DefendantU.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-091COMPLAINT against U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5198934) filed by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-09Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (jd) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-132SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-143MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robin F. Thurston, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- P.O. Box 34553, Washington, D.C. 20043. Phone No. - (202) 701-1775. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5204553. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-14MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice : The motion for admission pro hac vice does not comply with all relevant local rules. Local Rule 83.2(d)(5) requires that attorneys seeking to appear pro hac vice before this Court include in their declarations "the number of times the attorney has been admitted pro hac vice in this Court in the last two years." Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/14/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/16/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/16/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-275MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robin F. Thurston, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- P.O. Box 34553, Washington, DC 20043. Phone No. - (202) 448-9090. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5221879. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-27MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Robin F. Thurston is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/27/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-306MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- J. Adam Skaggs, :Firm- Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, :Address- 223 West 38th Street, #90, New York, NY 10018. Phone No. - (917) 680-3473. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5227642. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-30MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that J. Adam Skaggs is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/30/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-197NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-198Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-199ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-20MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time of One Day, Nunc Pro Tunc : It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is now due by December 19, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/20/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-20MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before January 3, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/20/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2018-01-0310Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Schedule by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-03MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit a joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter by January 8, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/03/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-0811Joint STATUS REPORT by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-0912SCHEDULING ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/09/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-02-1613Joint STATUS REPORT by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-04-2614Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-05-2115Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before July 23, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/22/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/23/2018 (tj) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-07-2316Joint STATUS REPORT by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 23, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/23/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2018. (gdf) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-10-2317Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/23/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2019-01-1618MOTION to Stay (Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations) by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-1819RESPONSE re 18 MOTION to Stay (Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations) Notice of Non-Opposition filed by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-24MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion to Stay: it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending restoration of appropriations to the Department of Justice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all current deadlines for the parties shall be extended commensurate with the calendar day duration of the lapse in appropriations and Defendant's counsel shall notify the Court within 14 days of Congress appropriating funds for the Department of Justice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if appropriations have not be restored by January 29, 2019, the joint status report currently due on February 4, 2019 shall be filed within 7 days following the restoration of appropriations. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/24/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-02-0420Joint STATUS REPORT by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before May 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/5/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/15/2019 (tj) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-05-1521Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-05-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 21 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 17, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/15/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar