Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02409
Date Filed2017-11-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Protect Democracy Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications pertaining to the AT&T-Time Warner merger and any attempt to force Jeffrey Zucker, the head of CNN, to resign. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and suggested that the Protect Democracy Project narrow the scope of its request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Protect Democracy Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
950 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20530
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-091COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5199609) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (FOIA Request), # 2 Exhibit B (DOJ OIP letter), # 3 Exhibit C (DOJ Antitrust Division letter), # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons to U.S. Department of Justice, # 6 Summons to the U.S. Attorney General, # 7 Summons to the U.S. Attorney)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-15Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-152SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-12-063RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/24/2017 (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/24/2017. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/29/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/29/2017. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-216NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-267GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/26/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
2017-12-268Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
2017-12-26MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 1/11/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/26/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
2017-12-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/11/2018, (tj) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2018-01-119ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Federighi, Carol) Modified to add link on 1/12/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-11MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 1/26/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/11/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-2410Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-25MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The proposed schedule for briefing and disclosure is now due on or before February 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/25/2018. (lckbj2) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/2/2018 (gdf) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-02-0211Joint PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) Modified event title on 2/5/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-06MINUTE ORDER adopting the parties' proposed schedule. Based in the representations in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following deadlines are set in this matter: Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint on or before 2/9/2018; Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to any amended complaint on for before 2/23/2018; and the parties shall file a joint status report on or before 3/5/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/6/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-0912AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Summons to Defendant, # 7 Summons to Attorney General, # 8 Summons to U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-1213SUMMONS (3) Reissued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (znmw) (Main Document 13 replaced on 2/12/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-2314ANSWER to 12 Amended Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-0215Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-07MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint status report on or before 3/9/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/07/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-0916Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-09MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 4/9/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/09/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-04-0917Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-11MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 7/31/2018, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/11/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff