Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02427
Date Filed2017-11-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Public Integrity filed a FOIA request with U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning civil claims filed against the agency that alleged constitutional violations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Public Integrity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-091COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5199927) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to CBP, # 3 Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons to Attorney General)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-092LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-09Case Assignned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/14/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/14/2017. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-225NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 11/27/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/20/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Tracking Info - CBP, # 2 Exhibit USPS Tracking Info - Attorney General)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff