Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02438
Date Filed2017-11-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCOMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCompetitive Enterprise Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for correspondence and attachments sent to or from Trigg Talley relating to the Paris climate agreement. CEI also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver, which the State Department denied. CEI submitted a second FOIA request for correspondence and attachments sent to or from Alex Costello concerning the Paris climate agreement. CEI also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver for that request as well. The State Department denied the request for expedited processing and a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CEI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5201855) filed by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for the Attorney General, # 3 Summons for the U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons for the agency, the Department of State)(Kazman, Sam) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-142Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Kazman, Sam) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-14Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (md) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/27/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/27/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/28/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/27/2017. (Kazman, Sam) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-225NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-226ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Schaefer, Daniel) Modified to add link on 12/26/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-01-02MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by January 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/2/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-037NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Devin Watkins on behalf of COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE (Watkins, Charles) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-198Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-24MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 8 joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by March 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/24/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-03-019Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-02MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 9 joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report, including a proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, by April 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/2/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-1310Case directly reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta as related to 17cv2032 (APM). Judge Timothy J. Kelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-19CASE CONSOLIDATED. Case 17-2438 has been consolidated with 17-2032 pursuant to a Minute Court Order entered 3/2/2018. From this date forward all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in the lead earlier case, Civil Action No. 17-2032. The parties are advised NOT to elect to SPREAD text when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff