Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD et al v. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02448
Date Filed2017-11-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffNATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD
TERMINATED: 04/05/2019
PlaintiffMIJENTE SUPPORT COMMITTEE
PlaintiffDETENTION WATCH NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, Muente Support Committee, and Detention Watch submitted 20 FOIA requests to regional offices of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning Operation Mega. The agency acknowledged receipt of 19 of the requests and told the organizations that the request was too broad. Based on information learned from ICE, the organizations clarified their requests to encompass another program called Operation Safety City. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the organizations filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantIMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-131COMPLAINT against IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5202424) filed by NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD, DETENTION WATCH NETWORK, MIJENTE SUPPORT COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Agency, # 3 Summons to Attorney General, # 4 Summons to U.S. Attorney)(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/1/2017) (znmw). (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-142Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-143Corporate Disclosure Statement by MIJENTE SUPPORT COMMITTEE. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-144Corporate Disclosure Statement by DETENTION WATCH NETWORK. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-145NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Kirkpatrick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-146MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paromita Shah, :Firm- National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, :Address- 14 Beacon Street, Suite 602, Boston, MA 02108. Phone No. - (617) 227-9727. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5204168. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DETENTION WATCH NETWORK, MIJENTE SUPPORT COMMITTEE, NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paromita Shah, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-147MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sejal Zota, :Firm- National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, :Address- 14 Beacon Street, Suite 602, Boston, MA 02108. Phone No. - (617) 227-9727. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5204211. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DETENTION WATCH NETWORK, MIJENTE SUPPORT COMMITTEE, NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sejal Zota, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-14Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (md) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-15SUMMONS Not Issued as to IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. (INCORRECT SUMMONS WERE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED. FOIA SUMMONS NEED TO BE SUBMITTED) (md) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-158REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE with Corrected Summons Attached filed by NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD, DETENTION WATCH NETWORK, MIJENTE SUPPORT COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Agency Summons, # 2 Corrected Attorney General Summons, # 3 Corrected U.S. Attorney Summons)(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-169SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-1710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/17/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/17/2017. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-17MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Paromita Shah is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/17/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-17MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Sejal Zota is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/17/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-12-1811ANSWER to Complaint by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-1812ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before January 8, 2018. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/18/2017. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2018-01-0813Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the following deadlines shall govern this matter: (1) Defendant shall produce at least the first 500 responsive pages to Plaintiffs on or before February 20, 2018; (2) Defendant shall disclose to Plaintiffs the estimated total number of potentially responsive pages as soon as feasible, but at least prior to March 6, 2018; and (3) the parties shall file another Joint Status Report, on or before March 6, 2018, that updates the court on their progress and proposes a production schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/09/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-09Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-03-0614Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 March 6, 2018, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before May 2, 2018, that updates the court regarding the production of records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/06/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/2/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-05-0215Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 May 2, 2018, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before August 14, 2018, that updates the court regarding the production of records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/03/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-03Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 8/14/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/06/2018)
2018-08-1416Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 August 14, 2018, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before November 14, 2018, that updates the court regarding the production of records. In that Status Report, Defendant shall indicate the number of pages remaining to be processed and potentially produced. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/15/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/14/2018. (tg) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-11-1417Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 November 14, 2018, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before February 14, 2019, that updates the court as outlined in the parties' Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/15/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2019-02-1418Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-19MINUTE ORDER. No later than April 15, 2019, the parties shall advise the court whether summary judgment briefing will be required in this case and, if so, propose a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/19/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 03/03/2019)
2019-04-0319NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DETENTION WATCH NETWORK, MIJENTE SUPPORT COMMITTEE, NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD. Attorney Sejal Ramnik Zota terminated. (Zota, Sejal) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-0520STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Plaintiff National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild Only by DETENTION WATCH NETWORK, MIJENTE SUPPORT COMMITTEE, NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-0821NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DETENTION WATCH NETWORK, MIJENTE SUPPORT COMMITTEE. Attorney Paromita Hasmukh Shah terminated. (Zota, Sejal) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-1522Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-1623ORDER entering the briefing schedule proposed in the parties' 22 Joint Status Report. The schedule for further proceedings in this matter is as follows: (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before June 20, 2019; (2) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before July 19, 2019; (3) Defendant's Reply in Support of Summary Judgment and Opposition to any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before August 22, 2019; and (4) Plaintiff's Reply in Support of any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before September 20, 2019. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/16/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 7/19/2019. Response to Cross Motion due by 8/22/2019. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/20/2018. Summary Judgment motion due by 6/20/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/19/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/22/2019. (tb) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-06-1224Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-12MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Defendant's Consent Motion for Modification of Briefing Schedule. The schedule for further proceedings in this matter is as follows: (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before July 31, 2019; (2) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before August 30, 2019; (3) Defendant's Reply in Support of Summary Judgment and Opposition to any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before September 30, 2019; and (4) Plaintiff's Reply in Support of any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before October 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/12/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/31/2019. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/30/2019. Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 9/30/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 10/30/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-07-2525Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule and Extend Existing Summary Judgment Briefing Deadlines by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-26MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Defendant's Consent Motion for Modification of Briefing Schedule. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before September 6, 2019; Plaintiffs' Combined Opposition and Cross-motion for Summary Judgment due shall be due on or before October 11, 2019; Defendant's Combined Opposition and Reply shall be due on or before November 1, 2019; and Plaintiffs' Reply shall be due on or before November 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/26/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/6/2019. Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-motion due by 10/11/2019. Defendant's Opposition and Reply due by 11/1/2019. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 11/22/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-09-0326Consent MOTION to Vacate Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-0327ORDER granting 26 Consent Motion to Vacate Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/03/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar