Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02449
Date Filed2017-11-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Democracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning the Trump administration's decision to curtail the agency's Teen Pregnancy Prevention program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency then announced a $10 million teen pregnancy prevention research program and told DFF that it would respond to its request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Defendant2255
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
200 Independence Ave SW
Washington, DC 20201
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-131COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5203131) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-17Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-172SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-12-223RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/4/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/3/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/4/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-01-034NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-035MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-04MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file its opposition, if any, to Defendant's 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by January 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/4/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-056RESPONSE re 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Perryman, Skye) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-08MINUTE ORDER granting in part Defendant's 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown and nunc pro tunc to January 3, 2018, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED IN PART. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by January 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/8/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-227MOTION to Stay Entire Case in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-238ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Yee, Marsha) Modified to add link on 1/24/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-24MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Stay. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown and nunc pro tunc to January 22, 2018, that Defendant's motion to stay is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The request for a stay is denied in light of the end of the government shutdown. However, Defendant's motion is granted insofar as it sought an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Accordingly, Defendant's 8 answer is deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/24/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-24MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by February 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/24/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 2/7/2018. (kh) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-02-079Joint STATUS REPORT (Proposed Schedule) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-0710RESPONSE re 9 Status Report filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Perryman, Skye) Modified event title on 2/8/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-09MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 9 Status Report and Plaintiff's 10 Response, it is hereby ORDERED that parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by May 1, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file an interim status report advising the Court of the status of document production by March 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/9/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-1211NOTICE Regarding Joint Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-03-1612Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-04-1713NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jeffrey B. Dubner on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION Substituting for attorney Skye L. Perryman (Dubner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-1914NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine T. Morse on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-05-0115Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-02MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by June 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/2/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff