Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02468
Date Filed2017-11-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning Nation of Islam Mosque #7 in Harlem. The agency told Judicial Watch that it found no records. Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal to the Office of Information Policy, which upheld the FBI's decision. Judicial Watch then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5207325) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-152LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-15Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (md) (Entered: 11/19/2017)
2017-11-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 11/19/2017)
2017-12-084NOTICE of Appearance of Eric W. Lee by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-11NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Notice (Other); emailed to porfanedes@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Incorrect event used, 3. In future, appearing attorney must file own Notice of Appearance using his assigned ECF login. (znmw, ) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/11/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/10/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/11/17., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. served on 12/11/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-266GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/26/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
2018-01-087NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-088Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-089NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Rhonda Campbell (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-08MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 2/16/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/8/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-02-1610ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-21MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 3/7/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/21/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-0711First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-0812PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Eric) Modified event title on 3/9/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-09MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the following briefing schedule is set in this matter: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before 4/19/2018; Plaintiff's consolidated opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment is due on or before 5/23/2018; Defendant's consolidated reply and cross-motion opposition is due on or before 6/13/2018; Plaintiff's cross-motion reply is due on or before 7/6/2018. In light of the adoption of the parties' briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's 11 Motion for an Extension of Time to Submit a Briefing Schedule is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/09/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-04-1913MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of D. Hardy)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff