Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCalifornia Reinvestment Coalition et al v. United States Office of the Comptroller of the Currency
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2017cv06631
Date Filed2017-11-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Sallie Kim
PlaintiffCalifornia Reinvestment Coalition
PlaintiffInner City Press
Case DescriptionThe California Reinvestment Coalition and Inner City Press submitted FOIA requests to the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency for records concerning certain financial institutions that went bankrupt. The agency told the requesters that the online request was not proper because it did not have an attachment. The agency agreed to accept the attachment by email. However, after the agency had received the perfected request, the requesters heard nothing further from the agency and filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Office of the Comptroller of the Currency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-171COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief (1) Violations of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. Section 552 et seq. against United States Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-11885898). Filed by California Reinvestment Coalition, Inner City Press. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaster, James) (Filed on 11/17/2017) Modified on 11/20/2017 (tnS). (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-172Proposed Summons. (Kaster, James) (Filed on 11/17/2017) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-173MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11885973) filed by California Reinvestment Coalition, Inner City Press. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Krause, Lindsey) (Filed on 11/17/2017) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-174Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/1/2017. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-205ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-206Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order for Mag. Judge Sallie Kim, #(2) Standing Order for All Judges) (tnS) (Filed on 11/20/2017) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-207Summons Issued as to Defendant United States Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (tnS) (Filed on 11/20/2017) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-218CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Reinvestment Coalition, Inner City Press.. (Krause, Lindsey) (Filed on 11/21/2017) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-12-209AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Electronic Filing, Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines, Standing for all Judges, Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim, Consent or Declination to Magistrate Jurisdiction, Joint Case Management Statement and Proposed Order served on United States Office of the Comptroller of the Currency on 11/21/2017, filed by California Reinvestment Coalition, Inner City Press. (Krause, Lindsey) (Filed on 12/20/2017) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2018-01-0810AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Exhibit A., Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment, Order Setting Individual Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines, Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim, Standing Order for All Judges, The Court's Form for the Joint Case Management Statement & Proposed Order, The Court's Consent or Declination ot Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form served on U.S. Department of Justice on 12/20/2017, filed by California Reinvestment Coalition, Inner City Press. (Krause, Lindsey) (Filed on 1/8/2018) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-0811AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Exhibit A., Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment, Order Setting Individual Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines, Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim, Standing Order for All Judges, The Court's Form for the Joint Case Management Statement & Proposed Order, The Court's Consent or Declination ot Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form served on U.S. Attorney General on 12/20/2017, filed by California Reinvestment Coalition, Inner City Press. (Krause, Lindsey) (Filed on 1/8/2018) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-2412MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by California Reinvestment Coalition, Inner City Press. (Krause, Lindsey) (Filed on 1/24/2018) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-2513ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 12 Motion to Appear by Telephone.C ounsel is directed to contact CourtCall at 888-882-6878 to arrange the appearance. Local counsel shall appear in person on behalf of Plaintiffs at the case management conference. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-02-0514STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference Date and Deadlines filed by United States Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Chang, Douglas) (Filed on 2/5/2018) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-0615ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 14 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2018. Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-0616CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant United States Office of the Comptroller of the Currency shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/20/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-2317CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant United States Office of the Comptroller of the Currency shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. by 3/9/2018 Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-0218CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Office of the Comptroller of the Currency.. (Chang, Douglas) (Filed on 3/2/2018) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-0219ANSWER to Complaint filed by United States Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Chang, Douglas) (Filed on 3/2/2018) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-0720STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference Date and Deadlines filed by United States Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Chang, Douglas) (Filed on 3/7/2018) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-0821ORDER AS MODIFIED by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 20 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference Date and Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2018. Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-04-2522STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference Date and Deadlines filed by United States Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Chang, Douglas) (Filed on 4/25/2018) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-3023ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 22 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2018. Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff