Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02489
Date Filed2017-11-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for communications between the agency and the Podesta Group. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5210794) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-172LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-20Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-12-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/11/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/10/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/11/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 12/11/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-185NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2018-01-106ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Sroka, Scott) Modified to add link on 1/11/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-10MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by January 24, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 01/10/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/24/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-257Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-25MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report on or before February 7, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/25/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-02-078Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-08MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report on or before March 7, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/8/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/7/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-03-079Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/14/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-08MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report on or before May 14, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/7/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-05-1410Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they shall submit a further Joint Status Report on or before June 21, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/14/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff