Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02503
Date Filed2017-11-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas F. Hogan
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security, the U.S. Army, and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records about Black Identity Extremists. Property of the People and Shapiro also requested expedited processing. DHS acknowledged receipt of the request, but did not respond to the request for expedited processing. The U.S. Army acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Property of the People and Shapiro to narrow the scope of their request, which they did. The Office of the Director of National Intelligence failed to acknowledge receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Property of the People and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Fee Category - Media or Educational, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES ARMY
TERMINATED: 02/01/2018
DefendantUNITED STATES ARMY
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-201COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES ARMY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5212647) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-202LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-20Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (jd) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-203SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) Modified on 12/15/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2018-02-014AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-025SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (znmw) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/05/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/5/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/7/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 2/8/2018; DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/5/2018; OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 2/9/2018 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-077NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-078ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-079ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-0710ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-20MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report and proposed briefing schedule on or before April 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on March 20, 2018. (lctfh4). (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/19/2018 (hs) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-04-1911Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-20MINUTE ORDER granting 11 defendants' Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report and proposed briefing schedule on or before April 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on April 20, 2018. (lctfh4). (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2018 (hs) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2612Joint STATUS REPORT by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before July 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on May 14, 2018. (lctfh4). (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/13/2018. (hs) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-07-1313Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-18MINUTE ORDER granting 13 defendants' Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before July 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 18, 2018. (lctfh4). (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/20/2018 (hs) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-2014Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-27MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before September 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 27, 2018. (lctfh4). (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2018 (hs) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-09-1415Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-19MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before November 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on September 19, 2018. (lctfh4). (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/14/2018 (hs) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-11-1416Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-28MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before January 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 28, 2018 (lctfh4). (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/30/2019 (hs) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2019-01-3017Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-31MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on January 31, 2019.(lctfh4). (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2019 (hs) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-2118Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-25MINUTE ORDER: DHS-HQ is hereby ORDERED to complete production of all responsive, non-exempt records by April 15, 2019, or show good cause why it has not done so. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before April 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on February 25, 2019. (lctfh4). (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 4/15/2019. Joint Status Report due by 4/19/2019 (hs) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-04-1919Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-2220NOTICE of Filing of Declaration by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James V.M.L. Holzer)(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-24MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 28, 2019. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs may file a response to DHS-HQ's Declaration [ECF No. 20] on or before April 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on April 24, 2019. (lctfh4). (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2019, Plaintiff's response to DHS-HQ's Declaration [ECF No. 20] due by 4/30/2019 (hs) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-06-2721Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-07-11MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before August 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 11, 2019. (lctfh4). (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2019 (gdf) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-08-0722NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Moustakas on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES ARMY Substituting for attorney Melanie Hendry (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-2723Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-10-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before October 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on October 10, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2019 (hs) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-11-07MINUTE ORDER. The parties were due to file a joint status report by October 28, 2019 pursuant to the 23 August 27, 2019 Joint Status Report and the October 10, 2019 Minute Order. It is ORDERED that the joint status report shall be filed immediately, i.e. no later than November 14, 2019, along with a short explanation for the failure to timely file. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 7, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/14/2019 (hs) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-1424Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-1425RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar