Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02510
Date Filed2017-11-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted 13 FOIA requests to the regional offices of the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning Secretarial Order 3354, encouraging more leases for oil drilling on federal lands. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and asked WildEarth Guardians if its request could be consolidated into one response. WildEarth Guardians agreed to consolidate the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-201COMPLAINT against U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5214744) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-202Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-20Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-12-064NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2018-01-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/4/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/3/2018. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-036ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Walker, Johnny) Modified to add link on 1/4/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-037ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before January 18, 2018. The Joint Status Report shall include: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/3/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/18/2018. (mac) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-048NOTICE of Appearance by Neil S. Kagan on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Kagan, Neil) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-189Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
2018-01-19MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before March 7, 2018, that updates the court on Defendant's search and production efforts and, if needed, proposes a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/19/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/7/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-03-0710Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-07MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before June 5, 2018, that updates the court on Defendant's search and production efforts and, if needed, proposes a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/7/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff