Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02512
Date Filed2017-11-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning Secretarial Order 3354, encouraging more leases for oil drilling on federal lands. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told WildEarth Guardians on several occasions that it was still processing the request. WildEarth Guardians submitted a second FOIA request for records concerning coordination with the Energy Department pertaining to Secretarial Order 3354. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request as well, but after hearing nothing further as to either request, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-201COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5214811) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Nokes, Kelly) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/22/2017) (sth). (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-202Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-20Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sth) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(sth) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-12-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/4/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/3/2018. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-295NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
2017-12-296ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
2018-01-027NOTICE of Appearance by Neil S. Kagan on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Kagan, Neil) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-03MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before January 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/03/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-178Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before February 28, 2018 advising the Court of Defendant's progress in processing Plaintiff's FOIA request, and proposing a schedule for the remaining releases. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/17/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/28/2018 (tj) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-02-229Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 11, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/22/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/11/2018. (tj) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-04-1110Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before May 18, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/11/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/18/2018. (tj) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-05-1811STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff