Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02516
Date Filed2017-11-21
Date Closed2018-03-23
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning Secretary Ryan Zinke's use of a non-commercial plane, and the amount of money budgeted for the Secretary's travel for 2016-2018. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. It made an interim disclosure of a single page pertaining to Zinke's travel on a commercial airliner. But after hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-211COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5216133) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 7.1 Certificate, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Department of the Interior, # 5 Summons Attorney General)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-212LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (zsb) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-22Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2018-01-114Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-12MINUTE ORDER granting 4 defendant's consent motion for extension of time. Defendant shall submit its answer or other response by January 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/12/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-225MOTION to Stay by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-23MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 5 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/23/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-236ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) Modified to add link on 1/24/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-24MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before February 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/24/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, by 2/21/2018. (jth) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-02-217Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to a file a Dispositive Motion or, in the Alternative, a Report Setting Forth the Schedule for the Completion of its Production of Documents or Other Resolution of this Action by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-23MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or a report setting forth its proposed production schedule no later than February 27, 2018.Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/23/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-018STATUS REPORT Regarding Production of Records by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-01MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file a joint status report by March 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/01/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-239STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff