Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBrooks v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2017cv24253
Date Filed2017-11-22
Date Closed2018-01-29
JudgeJudge Federico A. Moreno
PlaintiffJeffrey R Brooks individually and as personal representative of the Estate of DAVID H. BROOKS, deceased
Case DescriptionJeffrey Brooks, the representative for the estate of David Brooks, who died while in prison, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning David Brooks. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Jeffrey Brooks filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau Of Prisons,
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-221COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau Of Prisons,. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10209610, filed by Jeffrey R Brooks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summon(s), # 7 Summon(s), # 8 Summon(s))(Descalzo, Marissel) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-222Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-273Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau Of Prisons,, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jas) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-274Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index by Jeffrey R Brooks. Responses due by 12/11/2017 (Descalzo, Marissel) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2018-01-045ORDER denying 4 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel with leave to refile after Plaintiff files proof of service of the summons and complaint on Defendant. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/4/2018. (kcg) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-046NOTICE by Jeffrey R Brooks re 5 Order on Motion to Compel Notice of Filing Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Descalzo, Marissel) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-047SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Jeffrey R Brooks. Federal Bureau Of Prisons, served on 12/6/2017, answer due 2/5/2018. (jas) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-048SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Jeffrey R Brooks. US Attorney General, served on 12/7/2017, answer due 2/5/2018. (jas) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-049SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Jeffrey R Brooks. US Attorney's Office, served on 12/11/2017, answer due 2/9/2018. (jas) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-0510Clerks Notice to Filer re 6 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE# 7 , 8 , and { 9 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-1011Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint, by Federal Bureau Of Prisons,. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Federal Bureau Of Prisons,(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-1212ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's complaint no later than 1/24/2018. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/12/2018. (kcg) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-2413Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Federal Bureau Of Prisons,. (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-2914ORDER DISMISSING CASE as Moot Without Prejudice. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/26/2018. (kcg) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. (Entered: 01/29/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff