Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleREYNOLDS v. DOJ US ATTORNEY FOIA PRIVACY STAFF
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02484
Date Filed2017-11-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffMICHAEL CURTIS REYNOLDS
DefendantDOJ US ATTORNEY FOIA PRIVACY STAFF
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-14Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/09/2017. (zsb) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-141COMPLAINT against DOJ US ATTORNEY FOIA PRIVACY STAFF filed by MICHAEL CURTIS REYNOLDS. (Attachment: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(zsb) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-142MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL CURTIS REYNOLDS (zsb) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-12-213PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/21/2017. (zsb) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff