Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02549
Date Filed2017-11-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning two agency reports into allegations that employees or contractors were using encrypted communications to discuss responding to Trump administration policies. Cause of Action Institute submitted a second FOIA request for records about the use of encrypted devices. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told Cause of Action Institute that its first request would not incur fees. However, after hearing nothing further concerning either request, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-281COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5222133) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons EPA, # 11 Summons AG, # 12 Summons Clerk)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-282Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-283NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-29Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-294SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-295STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/29/17. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-12-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 12/4/2017 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-117RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/4/2017. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-118RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/11/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/10/2018. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2018-01-109ANSWER to 1 Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Simon, Jeremy) Modified to add link on 1/11/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-12MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than March 1, 2018. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) the status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 12, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order Or Each Party's Individual Recommendations due by 3/1/2018. (mac) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-02-2810Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-28MINUTE ORDER in view of 10 parties' joint status report, it is ordered that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report recommending next steps for further proceedings by April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/28/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2018. (mac) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-04-0911Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-12MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to submit a further joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings, if any, by no later than May 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 12, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/14/2018. (mac) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-05-1412Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-15MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to submit a further joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings, if any, by no later than June 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 15, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/26/2018. (mac) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-06-2613Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-29MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 13 parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to submit a further joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings, if any, by no later than July 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 29, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/26/2018. (mac) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-2614Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-26MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 14 parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to submit a further joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings, if any, by no later than September 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/26/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2018. (mac) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-09-1815Joint STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of 15 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than November 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/20/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2018. (mac) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-11-0516Joint STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-05MINUTE ORDER. In light of 16 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than December 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/5/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/6/2018. (mac) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-11-1417STIPULATION of Dismissal by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar