Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02561
Date Filed2017-11-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionProtect Democracy Project submitted FOIA requests to OMB and the Department of Commerce concerning records about the plans for the upcoming 2020 census. Protect Democracy Project also requested a fee waiver. The Commerce Department acknowledged receipt of the request and granted PDP's fee waiver request. OMB did not acknowledge the request. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Protect Democracy Project then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-291COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5224925) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Summons AG Summons, # 6 Summons US Atty Summons, # 7 Summons OMB Summons, # 8 Summons DOC Summons, # 9 Supplement Certificate LCvR 7.1)(Berwick, Benjamin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/27/2017) (znmw). (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-29Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsth) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-292SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-293LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (zsth) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-12-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/11/17. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/11/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/10/2018. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 12/8/2017; OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 12/11/2017 (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2018-01-107NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-108ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Kolsky, Joshua) Modified to add link on 1/11/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-04-209NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis John Lawson on behalf of PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2010MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew Larrabee, :Firm- Dechert LLP, :Address- 1095 Avenue of the Americas, NT, NY 10036. Phone No. - 212/698-3578. Fax No. - 212/314-0023 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5434977. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew Larrabee, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2011MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nicholas Passaro, :Firm- Dechert LLP, :Address- 1095 Avenue of the Americas, NY, NY 10036. Phone No. - 212/649-8755. Fax No. - 212/698-3599 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5435076. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nicholas Passaro, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2712ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/26/17. (lsj) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-2713ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/26/18. (lsj) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-06-2014STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-07-0615ORDER. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/6/2018. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/4/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-09-0416Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-11-0517STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-12-2118NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Paul Cirino on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Joshua M. Kolsky (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-0219Unopposed MOTION to Stay In Light of Lapse In Appropriations by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-1620ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/16/2019. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-2921NOTICE of Restored Government Funding by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-0122STATUS REPORT (Proposed Schedule for Further Proceedings) by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-2123Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-03-01MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall confer and submit another joint status report on or before April 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/01/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-04-2224Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-23MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall confer and submit another joint status report on or before June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/23/2019. (lcrcl1) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-23ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall confer and submit another joint status report on or before June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/23/2019. (lcrcl1) Modified on 4/25/2019 (zlsj). (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-05-01NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 4/23/2019 Minute Order was entered in error as a duplicative order. (lsj) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-06-2125Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-08-06MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit a further joint status report no later than 9/5/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/06/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-09-0526Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-06MINUTE ORDER: Parties shall submit a further joint status report no later than 11/4/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/06/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar