Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFreedom of the Press Foundation et al v. Department of Justice et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv09343
Date Filed2017-11-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John G. Koeltl
PlaintiffFreedom of the Press Foundation
PlaintiffKnight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Case DescriptionThe Freedom of the Press Foundation and the Knight First Amendment Institute submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, the National Security Agency, the CIA, and the Office of the National Director for Intelligence for records concerning limitations imposed by the First Amendment on law enforcement's ability to obtain and use records taken from the media. The plaintiffs also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. All the agencies acknowledged receipt of the request and most of them denied the plaintiffs requests for expedited processing and a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, the media organizations filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Justice
DefendantNational Security Agency
DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-11-291COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14413545)Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request)(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-292CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-293RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation.(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-294RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-295FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PARTY NAME ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Abdo, Alexander) Modified on 11/30/2017 (kl). (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-296FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PARTY NAME ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Abdo, Alexander) Modified on 11/30/2017 (kl). (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-297FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PARTY NAME ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Abdo, Alexander) Modified on 11/30/2017 (kl). (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-298REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-30CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (kl) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-30Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (kl) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-30Case Designated ECF. (kl) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-309ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (kl) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-30***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alexander Abraham Abdo to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): PLEASE LIST THE PARTY NAME FIRST. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (kl) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-3010REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-3011REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-3012REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-3014ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Security Agency. (sj) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-11-3015ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency. (sj) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-0113ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice. (sj) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-1216AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Central Intelligence Agency served on 12/11/2017, answer due 1/2/2018; Department of Justice served on 12/11/2017, answer due 1/2/2018; National Security Agency served on 12/11/2017, answer due 1/2/2018; Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 12/11/2017, answer due 1/2/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Mail Delivery Confirmations)(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2018-01-0517NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: You are directed to appear for a pretrial conference, to be held on Monday, March 12, 2018, in Courtroom 12B, at 4:30pm in front of the Honorable John G. Koeltl. All requests for adjournments must be made in writing to the Court. For any further information, please contact the Court at (212)805-0107. Initial Conference set for 3/12/2018 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (mro) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-0918AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Central Intelligence Agency served on 12/18/2017, answer due 1/8/2018; Department of Justice served on 12/18/2017, answer due 1/8/2018; National Security Agency served on 12/18/2017, answer due 1/8/2018; Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 12/18/2017, answer due 1/8/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation; Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Delivery Confirmations, # 2 Appendix Delivery Confirmations)(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-1719ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Barnea, Jean-David) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-3020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Alexander Abraham Abdo on behalf of Freedom of the Press Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. New Address: Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, 475 Riverside Drive, Suite 302, New York, NY, United States 10115, 6467458500. (Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-03-0521LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 17 Notice of Hearing, addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Alex Abdo dated 3/5/18. Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. Return Date set for 3/12/2018 at 04:30 PM.(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-0622ORDER: granting 21 Letter Motion for Conference. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, Part I on 3/6/2018) (ap) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-0923INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-1224ORDER. As discussed at the conference on March 12, 2018, the parties should submit a stipulation with respect to the progress in this case by March 21, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/12/2018) (rjm) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-2225STATUS REPORT. Stipulation and Proposed Order Document filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University.(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-2226STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENT SEARCHES AND PROCESSING: Defendants will produce any non-exempt records responsive to the attached Final Processing List ("FPL") in accordance with the terms of this Stipulation. Inclusion of particular types or categories of records in the FPL is not a concession by Defendants that such records exist or that they will not be withheld, in whole or in part, pursuant to FOIA's statutory exemptions. Defendants shall complete their searches for responsive records in accordance with the FPL within 60 days from the entry of this Stipulation. The timeframes contained herein are based on Defendants' best estimates of the time required to complete the searches, as of the date of this Stipulation. Should some or all Defendants require additional time to complete their searches, the Parties will meet and confer and either present a revised Stipulation to the Court, or, if they cannot agree, make their respective proposals regarding the search schedule to the Court, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/22/2018) (mml) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-07-2027JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 7/20/18 re: Proposed Processing/Production Schedule. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Barnea, Jean-David) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-2428MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 27 Letter Proposing Processing/Production Schedule, filed by Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/23/18) (yv) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar