Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02578
Date Filed2017-12-04
Date Closed2018-05-30
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionEnvironmental Integrity Project submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning public speeches and speeches given to third parties by Administrator Scott Pruitt. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Environmental Integrity Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-041COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5230314) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, # 2 Exhibit Ex B, # 3 Exhibit Ex C, # 4 Summons EPA Summons, # 5 Summons USAO, # 6 Summons US AG, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet (Greene, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-042Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Greene, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-043ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint,, COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Corrected EPA Summons, # 2 Summons Corrected US AG Summons, # 3 Summons Corrected USAO Summons)(Greene, Mary) Modified on 12/6/2017 (zsb). (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-04Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-05SUMMONS Not Issued as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General.....CORRECTED SUMMONS THAT WERE SUBMITTED ARE INCORRECT. FOIA SUMMONS NEED TO BE SUBMIITED TO THE COURT. (md) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-064ENTERED IN ERROR.....COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons EPA Summons, # 2 Summons OUSA Summons, # 3 Summons US AG Summons)(Greene, Mary) Modified on 12/6/2017 (zsb). (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-065STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/6/17. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-066SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2018-01-107ANSWER to 1 Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Peterson, Benton) Modified to add link on 1/11/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-11MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on February 21, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21, to discuss the schedule for further proceedings in this matter. The parties shall confer in advance of the status conference to narrow the issues for discussion. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/11/18. (lcrdm3, ) Modified on 1/11/2018 to correct date/year (kt). (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-11Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/21/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-118NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Benton G. Peterson (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-179NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Marina Utgoff Braswell (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-3010NOTICE of Appearance by Eric V. Schaeffer on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT (Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-02-21Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 2/21/2018. Joint Status Report due in thirty (30) days. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-2211Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-26MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that on or before May 7, 2018, Defendant shall submit to Plaintiff a declaration describing the search conducted by EPA in response to Plaintiff's FOIA request. It is further ORDERED that on or before May 21, 2018, Plaintiff shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal or, in the alternative, the Parties shall confer and file a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/26/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall submit to Plaintiff a declaration describing the search conducted by EPA by 5/7/2018. Parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal or Briefing Schedule by 5/21/2018. (dot) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-05-0312Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Declaration by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall submit to Plaintiff a declaration describing the search conducted by EPA on or before May 14, 2018, and the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or proposed briefing schedule on or before May 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/4/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall submit to Plaintiff a declaration describing the search conducted by EPA on or before 5/14/2018; The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or proposed briefing schedule on or before 5/28/2018. (kt) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-2913NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT (Greene, Mary) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-29MINUTE ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is hereby ORDERED to TERMINATE this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/29/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff