Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02582
Date Filed2017-12-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning travel and security costs for Secretary Ben Carson, and travel and security costs for former Secretary Shaun Donavan during his first year as Secretary. Public Citizen also requested a fee waiver. The agency denied Public Citizen's request for a fee waiver. Public Citizen filed an administrative appeal and the agency upheld its denial of a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-041COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5231688) filed by Public Citizen, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, # 3 Summons to the United States Attorney, # 4 Summons to the Attorney General)(Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-042LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Public Citizen, Inc. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-04Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsth) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-084NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Llewellyn on behalf of PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/5/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/4/2018. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/11/17. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-187NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-198Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-19MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have until February 5, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/19/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2018-02-059ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-05MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before February 19, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/05/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/19/2018 (tj) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-1610Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 6, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/21/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/6/2018 (tj) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-04-0611Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by May 7, 2018, if a joint stipulation of dismissal has not been filed by that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/09/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/7/2018. (tj) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-05-0712Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that 1) by May 11, 2018, HUD will provide additional documents to Public Citizen, without charging Public Citizen any fees for its search or production of such records; 2) by May 18, 2018, HUD will complete its response to Public Citizen's FOIA request, in accordance with FOIA requirements, and its production of responsive records to Public Citizen, without charging Public Citizen any fees for its search or production of such records; 3) by May 29, 2018, the parties will confer as to which, if any, issues remain outstanding; and 4) by June 8, 2018, the parties will provide a further joint status report to the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/07/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-06-0713Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff