Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02583
Date Filed2017-12-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas F. Hogan
PlaintiffGIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Case DescriptionThe Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning contacts with the National Rifle Association after the Las Vegas mass shooting, as well as White House talking points, particularly as they related to a public statement by the NRA. The Giffords Center also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Giffords Center that it was being placed in the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Giffords Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-041COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5231644) filed by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-04Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (jd) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-072SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice of Consent)(jd) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-133MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robin F. Thurston, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- P.O. Box 34553, Washington, DC 20043. Phone No. - 202-448-9090. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5247477. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-134MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- J. Adam Skaggs, :Firm- Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, :Address- 223 West 38th Street, #90, New York, NY 10018. Phone No. - (917) 680-3473. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5247502. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/11/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/11/2017. (See Docket Entry 5 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-15MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robin F. Thurston is hereby permitted to practice before this Court in case number 17-cv-02583. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/15/2017. (lctfh4). (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-15MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. J. Adam Skaggs is hereby permitted to practice before this Court in case number 17-cv-02583. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/15/2017. (lctfh4). (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2018-01-087NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-088Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff