Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02592
Date Filed2017-12-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted FOIA requests to the General Services Administration, Department of Commerce, Department of State, and Department of Defense for records reflecting charges made on government credit cards for expenses at Trump-owned properties. All of the agencies acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Property of the People and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fee Category - Media or Educational, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantGENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-051COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5232370) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-05Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsth) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-053SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-064GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/6/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2018-01-025Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-02MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 2/5/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/2/2018. (lckbj3) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-02-056ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-05MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 2/20/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/5/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-207Joint STATUS REPORT of the Parties by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-02-21MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before 3/28/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/21/2018. (lckbj3) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-288Joint STATUS REPORT of the Parties by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-30MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before 5/16/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/30/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-05-169Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-21MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 9 Joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 6/26/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/21/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-06-2610Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-07-02MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 7/26/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/02/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff