Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02594
Date Filed2017-12-05
Date Closed2018-07-11
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning Secretarial Order 3355 titled "Streamlining National Environmental Policy Act Reviews." based on President Trump's executive order instructing agencies to look at ways to encourage deregulation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told WildEarth Guardians that it would need to consult with other offices to process the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency as to when it would finish processing the request, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5233199) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Nokes, Kelly) Modified to replace fillable civil cover sheet on 12/8/2017 (jd). (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-052Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-05Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (jd) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/14/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/13/2018. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2018-01-105NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-116ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Rogers, Joshua) Modified to add link on 1/12/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-177NOTICE of Appearance by Neil S. Kagan on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Kagan, Neil) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/18/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-17MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by February 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/17/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/7/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-02-078Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-03-299Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-03MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall address any remaining issues, including attorneys' fees, and file either a proposed schedule for dispositive motions or a joint motion to dismiss on or before May 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/3/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule or Joint Dispositive Motion due by 5/14/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-05-1410Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-1711ORDER directing the parties to file either a proposed schedule for dispositive motions or a joint motion to dismiss no later than June 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/17/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed schedule for dispositive motions or a joint motion to dismiss due by 6/14/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-3012NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. Attorney Neil S. Kagan terminated. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-0813Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-1314ORDER directing the parties to file either a proposed schedule for dispositive motions or a joint motion to dismiss no later than July 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/13/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions or Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 7/13/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-07-1115STIPULATION of Dismissal by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff