Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAdelante Alabama Worker Center et al v. Department Of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv09557
Date Filed2017-12-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Gregory H. Woods
PlaintiffAdelante Alabama Worker Center
PlaintiffDetention Watch Network
PlaintiffGreater Birmingham Ministries
PlaintiffImmigrant Defense Project
PlaintiffSoutherners on New Ground
Case DescriptionAdelante Alabama Workers Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, and Southerners on New Ground submitted FOIA requests to the Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties at the Department of Homeland Security for a memorandum containing super-recommendations that were discussed in a 2015 report pertaining to a detention center in Alabama. The agency told the requesters it had located five responsive pages but was withholding them entirely under Exemption 5 (privileges). The requesters filed an administrative appeal and the denial was remanded for further explanation of the basis of the privilege claims. After hearing nothing further pertaining to the remand, the requesters contacted the appeals authority, which told them that they should consider the inaction a final decision. The requesters then filed suit.

DefendantDepartment Of Homeland Security
DefendantOffice for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-061COMPLAINT against Department Of Homeland Security, Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14441809)Document filed by Immigrant Defense Project, Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Detention Watch Network, Southerners on New Ground.(Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-062CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-063FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security; Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Pulver, Adam) Modified on 12/7/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-064REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-065REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-066FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security; Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Pulver, Adam) Modified on 12/7/2017 (pc). (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-067RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center.(Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-068RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Detention Watch Network.(Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-069RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Greater Birmingham Ministries.(Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-0610RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Immigrant Defense Project.(Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-0611RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Southerners on New Ground.(Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-07***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Adam R Pulver. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-07CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-07Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-07Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-0712ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-0713ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Homeland Security. (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-07***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Adam R Pulver to re Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): These parties are not parties listed on the complaint caption title. These parties are also not on CM ECF. (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-0714FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Pulver, Adam) Modified on 12/8/2017 (vf). (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-0715FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Pulver, Adam) Modified on 12/8/2017 (vf). (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-08***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Adam R Pulver to RE-FILE Document No. 15 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, 14 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): defendant name error; "Amended" not reflected on summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-0816REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-0817REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-1118ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Homeland Security. (vf) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-1119ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Homeland Security. (vf) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-1520MOTION for Patrick Daniel Llewellyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14483273. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Affidavit of Patrick D. Llewellyn, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-18>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 20 MOTION for Patrick Daniel Llewellyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14483273. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-1821FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jessica M. Vosburgh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14485242. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jessica M. Vosburgh, # 2 Exhibit Alabama Bar Certificate of Standing, # 3 Exhibit California Bar Certificate of Standing, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Vosburgh, Jessica) Modified on 12/18/2017 (bcu). (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-18>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 21 MOTION for Jessica M. Vosburgh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14485242. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. .. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Alabama and California;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-1822FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED MOTION for Jessica M. Vosburgh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Corrected Alabama Bar Certificate of Standing, # 3 Exhibit Corrected California Bar Certificate of Standing, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Vosburgh, Jessica) Modified on 12/18/2017 (wb). (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-1823SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Department Of Homeland Security served on 12/15/2017. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahearn, Civil Clerk. Document filed by Immigrant Defense Project; Adelante Alabama Worker Center; Greater Birmingham Ministries; Detention Watch Network; Southerners on New Ground. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-18>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 22 AMENDED MOTION for Jessica M. Vosburgh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. .. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Alabama and California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2018-01-0324ORDER granting 20 Motion for Patrick Daniel Llewellyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-0425NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Hilliard Dolinger on behalf of Department Of Homeland Security, Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. (Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-0526ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant must, no later than January 10, 2018, mail or email directly to the Orders and Judgments Clerk (judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov) a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this order (and also available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/consent-to-proceed-before-us-magistrate-judge); and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/5/2018) (anc) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-0827AMENDED MOTION for Jessica M. Vosburgh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Alabama Supreme Court Certificate of Standing, # 3 Exhibit California Supreme Court Certificate of Standing, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Vosburgh, Jessica) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-09>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 27 AMENDED MOTION for Jessica M. Vosburgh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-1028JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Patrick D. Llewellyn dated January 10, 2018 re: Proceeding Before Magistrate Judge. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground.(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-1129ORDER granting 27 Motion for Jessica M. Vosburgh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-1230ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties.(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-2231NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/22/2018) (mro) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-2332CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Patrick D. Llewellyn dated 1/23/2018. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground.(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-01-2433ORDER granting 32 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The parties' request to adjourn the initial pretrial conference, Dkt. No. 32, is granted. The initial pretrial conference schedule for February 14, 2018 is adjourned to February 22, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. The joint status letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's January 22, 2018 order are due no later than February 15, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 2/22/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/24/2018) (anc) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-02-1534STATUS REPORT. Joint Initial Status Letter Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground.(Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-22Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/22/2018. (Court Reporter Jennifer Thun) (Daniels, Anthony) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-2235ORDER: As discussed during the initial pretrial conference held on February 22, 2018, the Government is directed to produce its Vaughn index no later than April 2, 2018. Following production of the Vaughn index, and no later than April 16, 2018, the parties are directed to meet and confer regarding any remaining issues or anticipated motions. The parties are further directed to submit a joint status letter to the Court no later than April 18, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/22/2018) (anc) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-04-1836JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods dated 4/18/2018 re: Status Letter and Proposed Schedule. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties.(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-2737MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 36 Letter filed by Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department Of Homeland Security. ENDORSEMENT: The Court adopts the parties' proposed schedule. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is due no later than May 9, 2018. Plaintiffs' combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment is due no later than June 8, 2018. Defendants' combined opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion and reply is due no later than June 29, 2018. Plaintiffs' reply is due no later than July 20, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Cross Motions due by 6/8/2018. Motions due by 5/9/2018. Responses due by 6/29/2018. Replies due by 7/20/2018.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/27/2018) (anc) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-0938MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties.(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-0939MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. (Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-0940DECLARATION of James V.M.L. Holzer in Support re: 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - Released Records, # 3 Exhibit C - Vaughn Index)(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-06-0841MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground.(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-0842MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-0843RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-0844DECLARATION of Jessica Vosburgh in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (CRCL FY 2015 Report), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Skipworth Expert Report), # 3 Exhibit 2 (continued) (Skipworth Expert Report))(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-0845DECLARATION of Silky Shah in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-2646CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment . addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Samuel Dolinger dated 6/26/2018. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties.(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-2647ORDER granting 46 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court adopts the parties' proposed deadlines. Defendants' combined reply in support of their motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion is due no later than July 13, 2018. Plaintiffs' reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment is due no later than August 17, 2018. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 46. Responses due by 7/13/2018 Replies due by 8/17/2018. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/26/2018) (mro) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-07-1348REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment . and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. (Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1349DECLARATION of James V.M.L. Holzer (Second) in Support re: 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Release)(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-08-1450CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Patrick D. Llewellyn dated 8/14/2018. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground.(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-1551ORDER granting 50 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application granted. Plaintiffs may file a reply brief that is no longer than 15 pages. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 50. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/15/2018) (anc) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-1752REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-1753DECLARATION of Patrick D. Llewellyn in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Detention Watch Network, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Immigrant Defense Project, Southerners on New Ground. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Still Report), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Stern Report), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Appelbaum Report))(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar