Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc. v. Agency for Toxic Substances and Disease Registry et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv09580
Date Filed2017-12-06
Date Closed2018-05-02
JudgeJudge George B. Daniels
PlaintiffNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Natural Resources Defense Council submitted a FOIA request to the Agency for Toxic Substances and Disease Registry for records concerning the agency's review of the health effects of glyphosate. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told NRDC that it would be difficult to estimate the volume of responsive records. NRDC requested a fee waiver, which the agency granted. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantAgency for Toxic Substances and Disease Registry
DefendantUnited States Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-061COMPLAINT against Agency for Toxic Substances and Disease Registry, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14444062)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-062CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-063REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Agency for Toxic Substances and Disease Registry, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-064REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-065RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-06CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (sj) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-06Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (sj) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-06Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-066ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Health and Human Services. (sj) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-067ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Agency for Toxic Substances and Disease Registry. (sj) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-078INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/1/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/7/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2018-01-129ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Agency for Toxic Substances and Disease Registry, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-02-0610AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 12/13/2017, answer due 1/3/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-2211JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Mitchell Bernard, Geoffrey Berman, Emily Bretz dated 2/22/2018 re: Conference on March 1, 2018. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-2312MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 11 Letter filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/23/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-01Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/1/2018. Plaintiff Counsel: Mitchell S. Bernard, Joya C. Sonnenfeldt; Defense Counsel: Emily Elizabeth Bretz and Court Reporter present. The subsequent conference is scheduled for April 5, 2018 at 9:45 a.m. (Vega, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-3013LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Mitchell Bernard, Geoffrey Berman, Emily Bretz dated March 30, 2018 re: Request for adjournment of April 5 conference. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-0214MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 13 Letter filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to April 19, 2018 at 9:45 a.m. (Status Conference set for 4/19/2018 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/2/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-1215LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Mitchell Bernard, Geoffrey Berman, Emily Bretz dated April 12, 2018 re: Request for Adjournment of April 19 Conference. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Bernard, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-1316MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 15 Letter filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to May 17, 2018 at 9:45. So Ordered.( Status Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/12/2018) (js) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-05-0217STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY AGREED AS FOLLOWS: As soon as practicable after the Court has endorsed and docketed this Stipulation and Order, defendants shall pay to NRDC the sum of four thousand and three dollars ($4,003) for attorneys' fees and litigation costs...This Stipulation and Order may be executed in counterparts. Facsimile or pdf signatures shall constitute originals. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/2/2018) (ras) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff