Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWestern Watersheds Project v. United States Department of Interior
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityTucson Division
Case Number4:2017cv00592
Date Filed2017-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jennifer G Zipps
PlaintiffWestern Watersheds Project
Case DescriptionWestern Watersheds Project submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the Twin C grazing allotment on the Stafford Field Office of the Gila District of Arizona. The agency provided 1,119 pages with redactions and withheld an additional 1,919 pages under Exemption 5 (privileges). Western Watersheds Project filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Western Watersheds Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-071COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14938997 filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Bahr, David) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-072SUMMONS Submitted by Western Watersheds Project. (Bahr, David) (KEP) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-073Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Bahr, David) (KEP) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-074Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14938997. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bernardo P Velasco. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:17-CV-592-TUC-BPV. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-075Summons Issued as to United States Department of Interior. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-076SCHEDULING ORDER: defendant shall serve an answer or otherwise plead within thirty (30) days after service. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is six (6) months from the date the case is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 12/7/17. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-08Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for David Alan Bahr on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-297Magistrate Election Form Deadline resent on this date. (BAC) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
2018-01-088MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint by United States Department of Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bastron, Dennis) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-089SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Western Watersheds Project: Proof of Service re: Summons upon US Attorney's Offfice for Arizona, US Dept. of Interior, US Attorney General (the latter two at later dates) on 12/11/17. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-0810ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States Department of Interior answer due 2/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 1/8/18. (KAH) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-1911Magistrate Election Form Deadline re-sent on this date.(BAC) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
2018-01-1913Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-1914MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to District Judge, Jennifer G Zipps. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV17-592-TUC-JGZ. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-2315ORDER this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Bernardo P. Velasco for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1) and LR Civ. 72.1 and 72.2. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-17-0592-TUC-JGZ (BPV). Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 1/23/2018. (MFR) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-02-0916ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Department of Interior.(Bastron, Dennis) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-06-0517*Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings ; MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Hearing by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David). *Modified to correct motion type; modified to add motion type on 6/7/2018 (MFR). (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-1118ORDER that the Joint Motion to Vacate Proceedings and Scheduling Order Deadlines (Doc. 17 ) is GRANTED. This case shall be stayed until 7/16/2018, at which time the parties shall file a report of their progress as to the review and possible release of information subject to Defendant's supplemental search for information responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request. It is further Ordered the dispositive motion deadline set by the Case Scheduling Order (Doc. 6 ), currently scheduled for 6/7/2018 is VACATED (see attached Order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 6/11/2018. (MFR) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-07-1619Joint MOTION to Stay re: 18 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Vacate and Joint Status Report by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-2720ORDER granting 19 Joint Status Report and Second Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings. This case shall be stayed until August 15, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 7/25/2018. (See attached Order for details) (KEP) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-1321Joint MOTION to Stay re: 20 Order on Motion to Stay and Joint Status Report by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-1422ORDER granting 21 Motion to Stay. This case shall be stayed for 47 days, until October 1, 2018, at which time the parties will report their progress in resolving the costs and fee questions, disclose the status of settlement negotiations, and propose a briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 8/14/18. (KAH) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-09-2823Joint MOTION to Stay re: 22 Order on Motion to Stay and Fourth Joint Status Report by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-0124ORDER GRANTING 23 Motion to Stay. This case shall be stayed for 45 days, until 11/15/18, by which time the parties will report their progress in resolving the costs and fee questions, disclose the status of settlement negotiations, and propose a briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 10/1/18. (BAC) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-11-1325Joint MOTION to Stay re: 24 Order on Motion to Stay and Fifth Joint Status Report by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-1926ORDER GRANTING parties' joint 25 Motion to Stay. IT IS ORDERED that this case shall be stayed for 49 days, until 1/3/19, by which time the parties will report their progress in resolving the costs and fee questions and propose a briefing schedule, should one be necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 11/16/18. (BAC) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar