Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleYale Law School Center for Global Legal Challenges v. United States Department of State
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2017cv02042
Date Filed2017-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Vanessa L. Bryant
PlaintiffYale Law School Center for Global Legal Challenges
Case DescriptionYale Law School Center for Global Legal Challenges submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning legal citations for unclassified international agreements, other than treaties, submitted to Congress. The Center also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the Center's request and denied its requests for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The Center filed an administrative appeal of the fee waiver denial. On appeal, the agency granted the Center's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-071COMPLAINT against United States Department of State ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-4630907.), filed by Yale Law School Center for Global Legal Challenges. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Schulz, David) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-07Request for Clerk to issue summons as to United States Department of State. (Schulz, David) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-07Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-072ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/7/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-073STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/7/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-074ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/7/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-085NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 4 Order Re: Chambers Practices, Request to Issue Summons, 3 Standing Protective Order, 2 Electronic Filing Order, and 1 Complaint, filed by Yale Law School Center for Global Legal Challenges. Signed by Clerk on 12/8/2017.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-086ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States Department of State* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *David A. Schulz* *Ballard Spahr LLP* *919 Third Ave, 37th Flr* *New York, NY 10022*. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2018-01-037SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yale Law School Center for Global Legal Challenges. United States Department of State served on 12/20/2017, answer due 2/18/2018. (Schulz, David) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-02-228SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yale Law School Center for Global Legal Challenges. United States Department of State served on 1/19/2017, answer due 2/18/2018. (Schulz, David) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-239NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Larson on behalf of United States Department of State (Larson, John) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-2310ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by United States Department of State.(Larson, John) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-05-2411ORDER: Within 30 days, the parties are directed to meet and confer and file a joint status report regarding the progress of the case along with a joint proposed scheduling order that will facilitate continued progress. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/24/2018. (Lee, E.) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-06-2512Joint STATUS REPORT by United States Department of State. (Larson, John) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-2613ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Joint Status Report, Dkt. 12 , and adopts Defendant's position. Defendant is ordered to produce responsive records on or before 07/18/2018 and the parties are directed to file a second joint status report on or before 07/20/2018 regarding the progress of the case along with a joint proposed scheduling order that will facilitate continued progress. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/26/2018. (Lee, E.) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-07-1914Joint STATUS REPORT #2 by United States Department of State. (Larson, John) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-2015SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court adopts the deadlines proposed in the parties' second Joint Status Report. Final production is due on or before 12/18/2018 . The Court additionally sets a dispositive motion deadline for 02/18/2019 to the extent the parties ultimately find dispositive motions necessary. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/20/2018. (Lee, E.) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-09-2016Joint STATUS REPORT #3 by United States Department of State. (Larson, John) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar