Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02610
Date Filed2017-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Environmental Integrity Project submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning the decision to designate a certain rulemaking action "inactive." The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The Office of Chemical Safety and Pollution Prevention told EIP that it had been unable to locate records responsive to its request, but indicated that other components of the agency were still searching for records. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EIP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
1200 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20460
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-071COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5237989) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-H, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons EPA, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Kron, Adam) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-072LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT (Kron, Adam) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-08Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-204RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/14/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Kron, Adam) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-205RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 12/19/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Electronic Confirmation, # 2 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt)(Kron, Adam) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-206RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/20/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Electronic Confirmation, # 2 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt)(Kron, Adam) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2018-01-117NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-168Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-16MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have until January 30, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/16/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/30/2018, (tj) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-309ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Nebeker, William) Modified to add link on 1/31/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-31MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before February 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/31/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/14/2018 (tj) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-1410Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-14MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before February 23, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/14/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/23/2018 (tj) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-2311Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 16, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/23/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/16/2018 (tj) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-1612Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report containing a proposed production schedule on or before April 27, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/16/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/27/2018 (tj) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-04-2713Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Kron, Adam) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before July 12, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/27/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/12/2018 (tj) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-07-1214Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Kron, Adam) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 13, 2018, if a stipulation of dismissal has not been filed by that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/12/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/13/2018. (tj) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff