Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePrice v. The National Security Agency
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2017cv24440
Date Filed2017-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Darrin P. Gayles
PlaintiffJames Price
Case DescriptionJames Price, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the National Security Agency for records concerning the Vulnerabilities Equity Process. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Price filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantThe National Security Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-071COMPLAINT against The National Security Agency. Filing fees $ 400.00 No Filing Fee/No I.F.P., filed by James Price. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vmz) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-072Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (vmz) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
2017-12-113Clerks Notice re: Filing Fee - Outstanding/Pending. (jmd) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2018-01-024MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Price. (lk) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-05Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White no longer assigned to case; Case is regarding the Freedom of Information Act. (vjk) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-315NOTICE by The National Security Agency regarding service of process . Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party The National Security Agency(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-086NOTICE of filing summons by James Price. (vjk) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-097ENDORSED ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19 for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-098ORDER re 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 2/9/2018. (kmh) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-03-129MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Price. (lk) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-1210Financial AFFIDAVIT of James Price re 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Price (lk) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-1411ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service ordered . Summonses provided for issuance by Clerk for USM Service . Re: 6 Notice (Other) filed by James Price. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/13/2018. (sl) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-04-2312Summons Issued as to The National Security Agency, (lk) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-2313CLERK'S NOTICE of compliance and summons package placed in Marshal's Box in FTL re 11 ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service ordered . Summonses provided for issuance by Clerk for USM Service . Re: 6 Notice (Other) filed by James Price. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/13/2018. (sl) (lk) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-06-1114Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Court's Order re DE 11 by James Price. Responses due by 6/25/2018 (ebz) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-1315SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by James Price. The National Security Agency served on 5/16/2018, answer due 6/6/2018. (ebz) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-1416PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot 14 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/14/2018. (sl) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-1517NOTICE by The National Security Agency regarding service of process (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff