Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleALMEDA v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02641
Date Filed2017-12-08
Date Closed2020-02-07
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCELESTINO G. ALMEDA
Case DescriptionCelestino Alameda, who fought as a guerilla in the Philippines during World War II, submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Education for records concerning himself, and benefits for Filipino vets from the Department of Education and the Department of Veterans Affairs. Alameda submitted another FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for similar information. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Alameda filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Opinion/Order [40]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5239882) filed by CELESTINO G. ALMEDA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Civil Cover Sheet, # 15 Summons to U.S. Department of Education, # 16 Summons to U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, # 17 Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 18 Summons to U.S. Attorney General)(Watkins, Seth) (Attachment 14 replaced on 12/12/2017) (zsth). (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-082NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CELESTINO G. ALMEDA. Case related to Case No. 17-1497 and 17-2548. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-08Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsth) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-123SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-144Case randomly reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-145NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 12/13/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-148RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 12/14/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-149RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/14/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2018-01-1210ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(Walker, Johnny) Modified to add link on 1/16/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-17MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 2/9/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/17/18. (DJS) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/9/2018. (tb) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-02-0911Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-1312MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 11 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report and proposed order by April 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/13/18. (DJS) . (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/10/2018. (tb) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-04-1013Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-20MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ordered that another joint status report and proposed order are due 5/25/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/20/18. (DJS) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report and proposed order due by 5/25/2018. (tb) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-05-2514Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-06-01MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference is hereby set for 6/28/18 at 1:45 pm in Courtroom 9. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/1/18. (DJS) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-01Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/28/2018 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (tb) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-28Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 6/28/2018 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: The parties are to meet and confer and file a status report by 7/30/2018, per chance no documents exist, the Court expects agency counsel to be present at the next status conference set for 9/10/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (Court Reporter Crystal Pilgrim) (tb) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-3015Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Pl.'s Ex. 1, # 3 Pl.'s Ex. 2, # 4 Pl.'s Ex. 3, # 5 Pl.'s Ex. 4)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-0316TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan held on 06/28/18; Page Numbers: 1-18. Date of Issuance:08/03/18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced abo ve. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2018.(Pilgrim, Crystal) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-09-0517Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Pl.'s Ex. 1, # 2 Pl.'s Ex. 2, # 3 Pl.'s Ex. 3, # 4 Pl.'s Ex. 4)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-0718Supplemental STATUS REPORT by CELESTINO G. ALMEDA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-10Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 9/10/2018 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: The government shall file declaration regarding email retention policy and search procedures by 10/20/2018. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-1719TRANSCRIPT OF 9/10/18 STATUS HEARING before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan held on September 10, 2018. Page Numbers: 1-16. Date of Issuance: September 17, 2018. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/8/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2018.(Wayne, Bryan) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-10-1920Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Declaration by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-19MINUTE ORDER: Granting 20 Consent Motion for Extension of Deadlines. The Department of Veterans Affairs shall file a declaration regarding the email retention policy and search procedures by November 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/19/18. (DJS) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Declaration due by 11/19/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-11-1821NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order to File Declarations by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mildred Baxter, # 2 Declaration of Mark Hutchins, # 3 Declaration of Paulette Maten)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/18/2018)
2018-11-28MINUTE ORDER: By 12/20/18 the parties shall file a joint status report and proposed order for moving forward with this case. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/28/18. (DJS) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-12-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 12/20/2018. (tb) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-2022Joint STATUS REPORT by CELESTINO G. ALMEDA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-20MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 22 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint status and proposed order by January 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/20/18. (DJS) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2019. (tb) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-1823MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coles-Huff, Doris) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-22MINUTE ORDER: Granting 23 Motion to Stay. All Proceedings are hereby STAYED. Defendants' counsel shall notify the Court within FOURTEEN DAYS after Congress has appropriated funds for the Justice Department, and it is further Ordered, that all current deadlines for the parties shall be extended commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/22/19. (DJS) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-2924NOTICE of Restored Funding by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS re Order on Motion to Stay, (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-2525Joint STATUS REPORT by CELESTINO G. ALMEDA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order by Plaintiff, # 8 Text of Proposed Order by Defendants)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-28MINUTE ORDER: In view of Defendants' Notice of Restored Government Funding 24 , the previously imposed stay is hereby lifted. Further, having considered the parties' joint status report 25 , the parties are hereby directed to file a joint status report discussing, inter alia , a recommendation for further proceedings, on or before March 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/28/2019. (lctsc1) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2019. (tb) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-1826Joint STATUS REPORT by CELESTINO G. ALMEDA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order by Plaintiff, # 4 Text of Proposed Order by Defendants)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-04-04MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint 26 status report, the parties shall file another status report, on or before April 12, 2019, describing with particularity what issues remain in dispute and proposing a briefing schedule for the summary judgment motions. The joint report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/4/2019. (lctsc1) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/12/2019. (tb) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-1227Joint STATUS REPORT by CELESTINO G. ALMEDA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order by Plaintiff, # 4 Text of Proposed Order by Defendants)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-17MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 27 , the parties are hereby directed to adhere to the following deadlines: Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before May 17, 2019, Plaintiff's response and cross-motion shall be filed on or before June 14, 2019, Defendants' reply and response shall be filed on or before June 28, 2019, and Plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before July 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/17/2019. (lctsc1) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 6/14/2019. Response to Cross Motion due by 6/28/2019. Reply to Cross Motion due by 7/12/2019. Summary Judgment motion due by 5/17/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/14/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/28/2019. (tb) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-05-1628ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Extension of Time to by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) Modified on 5/17/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-17NOTICE OF ERROR re 28 Motion for Extension of Time to; emailed to johnny.walker@usdoj.gov, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document, 3. Document entered in the wrong case. Document has been refiled in the correct case. (ztd, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-1729Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-17MINUTE ORDER: Granting 29 Consent Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before June 7, 2019. Plaintiff's combined response and cross-motion shall be filed on or before July 5, 2019. Defendants' combined reply/response shall be filed on or before July 19, 2019. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before August 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/17/19. (DJS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 7/5/2019. Response to Cross Motion due by 7/19/2019. Reply to Cross Motion due by 8/2/2019. Summary Judgment motion due by 6/7/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/5/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/19/2019. (tb) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-06-0630Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-11MINUTE ORDER: Granting 30 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before June 12, 2019. Plaintiff's response and cross-motion shall be filed on or before July 10, 2019. Defendants' reply and response shall be filed on or before July 24, 2019. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before August 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/11/19. (DJS) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-1231Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-13MINUTE ORDER: Granting 31 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendants' motion for summary judgment due June 26, 2019. Plaintiff's combined response/cross-motion due July 24, 2019. Defendants' combined reply/response due August 7, 2019. Plaintiff's reply due August 21, 2019. tTe court will view with disfavor further requests for extensions by the Defendant. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/13/19. (DJS) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 7/24/2019. Response to Cross Motion due by 8/7/2019. Reply to Cross Motion due by 8/21/2019. Summary Judgment motion due by 6/26/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/24/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/7/2019. (tb) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-2632MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Michael Davis (with exhibit), # 4 Declaration of Jill Siegelbaum (with exhibits), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-2733ERRATA by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jill Siegelbaum (with exhibits))(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-07-2434Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by CELESTINO G. ALMEDA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts - Response to Defendant, # 3 Statement of Facts - Plaintiff's Statement, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins, # 6 Exhibit 1 to Watkins Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 2 to Watkins Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 3 to Watkins Declaration)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-2435Memorandum in opposition to re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CELESTINO G. ALMEDA. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts - Response to Defendant, # 2 Statement of Facts - Plaintiff, # 3 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Watkins Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Watkins Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Watkins Declaration)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-08-0736Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-08MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' consent motion 36 for an extension of time to file a reply is GRANTED. Defendants' reply in support of their motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before August 12, 2019, and Plaintiff's reply in support of his motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before August 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/8/2019. (lctsc1) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motion due by 8/12/2019. Reply to Cross Motion due by 8/26/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/12/2019. (tb) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-1237Memorandum in opposition to re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Genuine Issues)(Walker, Johnny) Modified linkage on 8/13/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-1238REPLY to opposition to motion re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-2639REPLY to opposition to motion re 34 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CELESTINO G. ALMEDA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins (Second Declaration)), # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2020-02-0740MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Defendants' 32 motion for summary judgment and Plaintiff's 34 cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/7/2020. (lcdl) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-0741ORDER granting Defendants' 32 motion for summary judgment and denying Plaintiff's 34 cross-motion for summary judgment. The case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/7/2020. (lcdl) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar