Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEdokobi v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2017cv03639
Date Filed2017-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Theodore D. Chuang
PlaintiffEmmanuel Edokobi
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantJeff Sessions (In His Personal Capacities)
DefendantRod Rosenstein (In His Personal Capacities)
DefendantDavid Salem (In His Personal Capacities)
DefendantU.S. General Services Administration
DefendantTimothy Horne (In His Personal Capacities)
DefendantOffice of the Inspector General
DefendantDaniel Livingston (In His Personal Capacities)
DefendantRonald Dawkins (In His Personal Capacities)
DefendantChristopher Cherry (In His Personal Capacities)
DefendantNacieve Owens (In His Personal Capacities)
DefendantAlex Hernandez (In His Personal Capacities)
DefendantRickety Parker (In His Personal Capacities)
DefendantMaryland Department of General Services
DefendantEllington Churchill, Jr. (In His Personal Capacities)
DefendantClaude Misher (In His Personal Capacities)
DefendantTerri Winston (In Her Personal Capacities)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-071COMPLAINT against Christopher Cherry, Ellington Churchill, Jr, Ronald Dawkins, Alex Hernandez, Timothy Horne, Daniel Livingston, Maryland Department of General Services, Claude Misher, Office of the Inspector General, Nacieve Owens, Rickety Parker, Rod Rosenstein, David Salem, Jeff Sessions, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. General Services Administration, Terri Winston, filed by Emmanuel Edokobi. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Proposed Summonses) (tds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-112Supplemental to 1 Complaint, filed by Emmanuel Edokobi (Table of Contents is the Main Document) (Attachment: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits) (tds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2018-01-083ORDER directing Edokobi to pay the filing fee or file a Motion for IFP within 28 days. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/5/2018. (c/m 1/8/2018 aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-08Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 84637031192 (aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-084CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/8/2018. (c/m 1/9/2018 aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-02-095Request for Conference (Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-126NOTICE Seeking leave to file Memorandum of Law and Authorities in Support by Emmanuel Edokobi (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-267Request for Conference (McFarland, Robert) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-04-188MEMORANDUM in Support of the Motion in Opposition to Federal Defendant's abd Co-Defendants' Motions for Pre-filing injunction on Plaintiff's future court filing and plaintiff provides arguments on consolidation of Plaintiff's Civil cases and this Memorandum is specific to Edokobi v. U.S. Department of Justice et al. (Civil case 8:17-cv-03639-TDC} and plaintiff requests for Court Hearing by Emmanuel Edokobi (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-209RESPONSE re 8 Notice (Other),, filed by Christopher Cherry, Ronald Dawkins, Alex Hernandez, Timothy Horne, Daniel Livingston, Office of the Inspector General, Nacieve Owens, Rickety Parker, Rod Rosenstein, David Salem, Jeff Sessions, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. General Services Administration.(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2410EXHIBIT Number 4 re 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of the Motion in Opposition to Federal Defendant's abd Co-Defendants' Motions for Pre-filing injunction on Plaintiff's future court filing and plaintiff provides arguments on consolidation of Plaintiff's Civil cases and this Memorandum is specific to Edokobi v. U.S. Department of Justice et al. (Civil case 8:17-cv-03639-TDC} and plaintiff requests for Court Hearing, by Emmanuel Edokobi. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-3011MOTION which Plaintiff requests the court to release Summons to be served upon defendants in the above captioned civil action and plaintiff requests for court hearing by Emmanuel Edokobi (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-0312ORDER directing Clerk to issue signed and seal summonses to plaintiff; directing plaintiff to serve defendants within 90 days of the date of this order; directing Clerk to mail a copy of this order to plaintff. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/2/2018. (c/m 5/3/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-0313Summons Issued 90 days as to Christopher Cherry, Ellington Churchill, Jr, Ronald Dawkins, Alex Hernandez, Timothy Horne, Daniel Livingston, Maryland Department of General Services, Claude Misher, Office of the Inspector General, Nacieve Owens, Rickety Parker, Rod Rosenstein, David Salem, Jeff Sessions, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. General Services Administration, Terri Winston.(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-06-1114SUMMONS Returned Executed (Declaration of Service) by Emmanuel Edokobi. Christopher Cherry served on 5/18/2018, answer due 7/17/2018; Ellington Churchill, Jr served on 5/18/2018, answer due 7/17/2018; Ronald Dawkins served on 5/29/2018, answer due 7/30/2018; Alex Hernandez served on 5/18/2018, answer due 7/17/2018; Timothy Horne served on 5/18/2018, answer due 7/17/2018; Daniel Livingston served on 5/18/2018, answer due 7/17/2018; Maryland Department of General Services served on 5/17/2018, answer due 7/16/2018; Office of the Inspector General served on 5/17/2018, answer due 7/16/2018; Nacieve Owens served on 5/18/2018, answer due 7/17/2018; Rickety Parker served on 5/18/2018, answer due 7/17/2018; Rod Rosenstein served on 5/21/2018, answer due 7/20/2018; David Salem served on 5/21/2018, answer due 7/20/2018; Jeff Sessions served on 5/21/2018, answer due 7/20/2018; U.S. Department of Justice served on 5/21/2018, answer due 7/20/2018; U.S. General Services Administration served on 5/18/2018, answer due 7/17/2018; Terri Winston served on 5/18/2018, answer due 7/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff