Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe University of Washington et al v. Department of Defense et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2017cv01854
Date Filed2017-12-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Marsha J. Pechman
PlaintiffThe University of Washington a Washington state agency
PlaintiffThe Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington a research center created by state law
PlaintiffAngelina Godoy Director of the Center
Case DescriptionThe Center for Human Rights at the University of Washington submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense, the Defense Intelligence Agency, and U.S. Southern Command for records concerning the 1981 alleged massacre in El Mozote, El Salvador, including records pertaining to various named individuals. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, the Center for Human Rights at the University of Washington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDepartment of Defense
DefendantDefense Intelligence Agency
DefendantUnited States Southern Command
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-111COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief for Violating FOIA against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5124269) Attorney Jordan Clark added to party Angelina Godoy(pty:pla), Attorney Jordan Clark added to party The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Jordan Clark added to party The University of Washington(pty:pla), filed by The University of Washington, Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-12Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (DJ) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-12NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) The University of Washington, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/19/2017. (DJ) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-12NOTICE to Filer: SUMMONS FORM INCOMPLETE - ATTORNEY ADDRESS BLOCK LEFT BLANK : Summons(es) cannot be issued because there is no address listed in the block for counsel. Please post your corrected summons(es) using the event "Praecipe for a Summons" found under "Other Documents." All summons(es) should be posted under this one event. Thank you. (DJ) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-132PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-143Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Department of Defense, (Attachments: # 1 Summons: Defense Intelligence Agency, # 2 United States Southern Command, # 3 Summons: U.S. Attonrey D.C., # 4 Summons: U.S. Attorney Seattle) (PM) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-154APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas R. Bourke FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5131075 (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-155CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-186ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas R Burke for Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, and The University of Washington, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2018-01-097DECLARATION of Service re 1 Complaint,, 3 Summons Issued, by Plaintiffs Angelina Godoy, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, The University of Washington (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-168ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/27/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/13/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/20/2018, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff