Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02665
Date Filed2017-12-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted five FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning proposed actions pertaining to coal mining operations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-131COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5246495) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General Summons, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney Civil Process Clerk Summons, # 4 Summons Bureau of Land Management Summons)(Wilcox, Stuart) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-132Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Wilcox, Stuart) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-13Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jd) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2018-01-054NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/26/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/25/2018. (Wilcox, Stuart) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-226MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-22MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant must file a responsive pleading by February 8, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/22/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-02-087ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-098ORDER. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before March 9, 2018. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/9/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-03-129NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-1310Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Late File Defendant's Status Report by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Status Report, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-14MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to File. The Clerk of Court is directed to file [10-1] defendant's status report on the docket. Defendant must complete its search by March 16, and it must complete its initial production of documents by March 30, 2018. The parties must file a joint status report by April 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/14/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-1411STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (jf) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-04-1312STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-1613NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Nokes on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Nokes, Kelly) (Main Document 13 replaced on 4/17/2018) (jf). (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-17MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court enters a schedule in accordance with either party's proposal, defendant must inform the Court by May 1, 2018 how many pages it anticipates it can process per month. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/17/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's notice to the Court regarding number of pages it can process per month due by 5/1/2018. (tb) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-2714NOTICE by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-04MINUTE ORDER. A Status Conference in this case is been scheduled for 5/10/2018 at 11:00 AM (EDT) in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Counsel for Plaintiff will be allowed to appear by telephone and will be advised by email of the dial in number and procedures by the Court's Deputy Clerk. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/4/2018. (jth) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-10Minute Entry for proceeding held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Status Conference held on 5/10/2018. Status Report from the parties is due by 5/17/2018. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-10MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff must inform the Court by May 17, 2018 whether it has narrowed its Freedom of Information Act request given the volume of documents involved, and whether it has been informed, after conferring with the defense, that its action has reduced the number of responsive pages. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/10/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-1715STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Wilcox, Stuart) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-18MINUTE ORDER. Defendant must continue to process a minimum of 1,000 pages per month, but it must make its best effort to process more pages each month if possible. Defendant must file a status report on June 18, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/18/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-06-1316NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. Attorney Patricia K. McBride terminated. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-1817STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-19MINUTE ORDER. Defendant must file another status report by July 20, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/19/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-07-1918STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-23MINUTE ORDER. Defendant must file another status report by August 20, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/23/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-08-2019STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-21MINUTE ORDER. Defendant must file another status report by September 20, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/21/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-09-1820NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelly E. Nokes (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-2021STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-20MINUTE ORDER. Defendant must file another status report by October 22, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/20/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-10-2222STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-22MINUTE ORDER. Defendant must file another status report by November 21, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/22/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar