Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDocuFreedom Inc. v. United States Department of Justice et al
DistrictDistrict of Kansas
CityKansas City
Case Number2:2017cv02706
Date Filed2017-12-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Daniel D. Crabtree
PlaintiffDocuFreedom Inc.
Case DescriptionDocuFreedom, Inc. submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for the records concerning entries in the library catalog at the Justice Management Division. The library catalogue is publicly available as a 6,562-page PDF file, but DocuFreedom alleged that many of the entries themselves were not publicly available. After hearing nothing from the agency, DocuFreedom filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantKaren McFadden
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-131COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4353381.), filed by DocuFreedom Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Hoppock, Matthew) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-132CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff DocuFreedom Inc.. (Hoppock, Matthew) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-13NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-13NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
2017-12-213DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff DocuFreedom Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hoppock, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-22SUMMONS ISSUED as to Karen McFadden, U.S. Department of Justice. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (sw) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-02-084SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by DocuFreedom Inc. upon All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt US Attorney, # 2 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt Karen McFadden)(Hoppock, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-085UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Karen McFadden, United States Department of Justice. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Robin) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-126ORDER granting 5 Defendants U.S. Department of Justice and Karen McFadden's Unopposed Motion to File Answer or Responsive Pleading Out of Time. Defendants are hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including 3/9/2018, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/12/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-03-097UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re 1 Complaint (attorney) by Plaintiff DocuFreedom Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Hoppock, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-128ORDER granting Plaintiff's 7 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and to Extend Defendants' Answer Deadline. Plaintiff is ordered to electronically file its First Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Pursuant to an agreement between the parties, Defendants are granted an extension of time, up to and including thirty (30) days after Plaintiff files its First Amended Complaint, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/12/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-159AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DocuFreedom Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit S, # 19 Exhibit T, # 20 Exhibit U, # 21 Exhibit V)(Hoppock, Matthew) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-04-1610UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Case for 45 days by Defendants Karen McFadden, United States Department of Justice. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Anderson, Robin) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-1911ORDER STAYING CASE. The Court hereby grants 10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Case for 45 Days. The Court finds that the requested 45-day stay of the case will save time and effort for the parties, counsel, and the Court by allowing time for Defendants to identify exemptions and statutory exceptions for withheld materials and begin production of the disclosable materials, which may moot Plaintiff's FOIA claims or narrow the issues. Accordingly, the Court hereby stays this case, including Defendants' answer deadline, all Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)and (f) requirements, pretrial proceedings, and discovery, for a period of 45 days up to and including until June 4, 2018 . Defendants shall file a status report on June 4, 2018 , which advises the Court regarding the status of Defendants' ongoing efforts to identify exemptions and exceptions and produce disclosable materials, and provides a proposal for further action in the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/19/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-06-0412STATUS REPORT by Karen McFadden, United States Department of Justice. (Anderson, Robin) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-0513ORDER CONTINUING STAY: The Court has reviewed Defendants' 12 Status Report which requests a 30-day extension of this Court's 11 Order Staying Case. The Court finds that Defendants have produced the majority of materials Plaintiff requested in its First Amended Complaint. The Court finds that extending the stay will allow the parties to resolve the remaining items and further discuss any remaining contested matters in this FOIA case. Accordingly, the Court hereby continues the stay of this case, including Defendants' answer deadline, all Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)and (f) requirements, pretrial proceedings, and discovery, for a period of 30 days up to and including July 5, 2018 . Defendants shall file a status report on July 5, 2018 , which sets forth the status of remaining pending issues, if any, and which proposes a briefing schedule to address any issues that remain in the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/5/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-07-0514STATUS REPORT by Karen McFadden, United States Department of Justice. (Anderson, Robin) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-0615ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: The Court has reviewed Defendants' 14 Status Report. As requested in the Status Report, a telephone status conference is set for 8/6/2018 at 01:30 PM (central time) before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James to discuss which, if any, scheduling deadlines need to be set in this matter beyond briefing, and the most effective and efficient briefing schedule that will put the remaining issues before the court for ultimate resolution. Participating counsel must dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/6/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-08-0616MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER from proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/6/2018. Plaintiff appeared through counsel, Matthew L. Hoppock. Defendants appeared through counsel, Robin R. Anderson. The parties reported they have made additional progress in resolving issues related to Defendants' production of materials Plaintiff has requested under FOIA. After discussion with counsel, the Court set the following deadlines. No later than September 6, 2018 , the Department of Justice shall make an agency decision regarding the release and production of item 42, as the parties refer to it, and advise Plaintiff of its decision. Defense counsel shall file a notice of compliance. No later than 30 days after the agency decision , Defendants shall file a brief setting forth argument on any items they have withheld on the grounds of work product or not being agency records. Plaintiff shall respond within 30 days of the filing of the motion . If Defendants feel a reply is necessary, it shall be filed within two weeks of Plaintiff's response . If the agency is unable to make its decision by September 6, defense counsel shall contact the undersigned Magistrate Judge's chambers before the deadline expires to seek an extension. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-09-0717ORDER. Defendants have advised they are still awaiting a decision by the Department of State regarding the single outstanding production issue in this FOIA case. Accordingly, Defendants seek an extension of the deadlines contained in the 16 order. After consideration of the matter, the Court extends the following deadlines. No later than October 9, 2018 , the Department of State shall make an agency decision regarding the release and production of item 42, as the parties refer to it, and advise Plaintiff of its decision. Defense counsel shall file a notice of compliance. No later than 30 days after the agency decision , Defendants shall file a brief setting forth argument on any items they have withheld on the grounds of work product or not being agency records. Plaintiff shall respond within 30 days of the filing of the motion. If Defendants feel a reply is necessary, it shall be filed within two weeks of Plaintiff's response. If the agency is unable to make its decision by October 9, defense counsel shall contact the undersigned Magistrate Judge's chambers before the deadline expires to seek an extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/7/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-10-0418NOTICE of Decision on Item 42 by Karen McFadden, United States Department of Justice (Anderson, Robin) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-2919MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Karen McFadden, United States Department of Justice (Anderson, Robin) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-2920MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Karen McFadden, United States Department of Justice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Anderson, Robin) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-11-2921***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE 22 FOR CORRECT FILING. ***RESPONSE by Plaintiff DocuFreedom Inc. re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hoppock, Matthew) Modified on 11/29/2018 (tvn). (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-2922RESPONSE by Plaintiff DocuFreedom Inc. re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (amending prior filing to correct certificate of service) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hoppock, Matthew) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-12-1223REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Karen McFadden, United States Department of Justice re: 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Robin) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar