Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02678
Date Filed2017-12-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Democracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Management and Budget for records concerning the members of the Regulatory Reform Task Force created under President Trump's executive order encouraging deregulation. The Democracy Forward Foundation also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-141COMPLAINT against DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5248381) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-142Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2017-12-14Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmd) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-194ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/19/2017. (DM) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-215MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Josephine Morse, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- P.O. Box 34553, Washington, D.C. 20043. Phone No. - (202) 701-1772. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5259340. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2018-01-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the 5 Motion to Admit Josephine Morse Pro Hac Vice . That motion is GRANTED CONTINGENT upon Ms. Morse's submission of a declaration by JANUARY 10, 2018 , stating that she has reviewed and is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 3, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-086NOTICE of Filing of Declaration of Josephine Morse by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-087RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 12/26/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/26/17., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/26/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/25/2018.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-01-258NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of All Defendants (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-259ANSWER to 1 Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Shapiro, Elizabeth) Modified to add link on 1/26/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-2610NOTICE of Errata by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Attachments: # 1 Errata Letter to Clerk of Court)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-03-0511ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter by APRIL 4, 2018 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 5, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/4/2018. (dot) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-2912NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Glover on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Glover, Matthew) (Main Document 12 replaced on 3/30/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-0413Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-27MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 13 Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule, which indicates that Defendant has begun a series of monthly productions in response to Plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act request. The Court adopts the parties' proposal that they submit a further Joint Status Report on or before JUNE 1, 2018 , to advise the Court of the parties' progress. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 27, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report to advise the Court of the parties' progress due by 6/1/2018. (dot) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-3114NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine T. Morse on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-05-3115Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, which indicates that Defendant continues to make a series of monthly productions in response to Plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act request. The Court adopts the parties' proposal that they submit a further Joint Status Report on or before JULY 16, 2018 , to advise the Court of the parties' progress. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 5, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2018. (kt) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff