Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv02684
Date Filed2017-12-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Privacy Information Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the FALCON and Investigative Case Management systems developed for the agency by Palantir Technologies. EPIC also requested inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EPIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-151COMPLAINT against IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5250106) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General for the United States, # 3 Summons Immigration and Customs Enforcement, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-152Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-15Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (jd) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-204STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached standing order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/20/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2018-01-055NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-106RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/28/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/27/2018. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-107RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/26/2017. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-108RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 12/26/2017 (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-299ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Sroka, Scott) Modified to add link on 1/30/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-01-30MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on March 14, 2018, at 10:10 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/30/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-30Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2018, at 10:10 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-02-2810NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-1411NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Jay Butler on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Butler, Alan) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 3/14/2018. A rolling production of documents of 500 pages or more shall begin on 3/29/2018, and follow each month thereafter. The parties shall file a joint status report in 60 days, and every 60 days thereafter. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-05-1412Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-15MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a further joint status report on or before July 16, 2018, that includes a recommendation on any necessary further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/15/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2018. (kt) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-07-1313Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-13MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a further joint status report on or before September 17, 2018, that includes a recommendation on any necessary further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/13/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2018. (kt) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-09-1714Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-18MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Status Report, Dkt. 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/18/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2018. (kt) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-11-1615Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-29MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 15, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a further joint status report on or before January 16, 2019, that includes a recommendation on any necessary further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/29/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/16/2019. (kt) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2019-01-1116Consent MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' consent motion to stay, Dkt. 16 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. This case shall be stayed until further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a revised briefing schedule as soon as Congress appropriates funding for the Department of Justice to resume work. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/14/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-02-18MINUTE ORDER: In light of the restoration of funding, this case is hereby UNSTAYED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 25, 2019 that includes a recommendation on any necessary further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/18/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/18/2019)
2019-02-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2019. (kt) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-2517Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-26MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 17, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before March 27, 2019, including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/26/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2019. (kt) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-03-2718Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-04-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 18, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 29, 2019, which will include a recommendation for further proceedings, if any. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/1/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2019, which will include a recommendation for further proceedings, if any. (dot) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-2919Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-29MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 19, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before May 29, 2019, including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/29/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2019. (kt) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-2920Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-29MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 20, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before June 12, 2019, including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/29/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/12/2019. (kt) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-06-1221Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-13MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 21, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before June 26, 2019, including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/13/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/26/2019, including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any. (dot) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-2622Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-07-02MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 22, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before July 24, 2019, including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/2/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/24/2019. (kt) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-1723Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 23, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 07/18/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2019. (kt) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-08-2024Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-08-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 24, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before September 19, 2019, including a recommendation for further proceedings, if any. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/21/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2019. (kt) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-09-0525NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeramie D. Scott (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar