Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGiffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2017cv07166
Date Filed2017-12-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson
PlaintiffGiffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence 268 Bush Street #555 San Francisco, CA 94104
Case DescriptionThe Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Justice concerning the influence of the NRA pertaining to various judicial nominations. The Giffords Center also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and indicated they were being processed by the Judicial Management Division, but after hearing nothing further, the Giffords Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington DC 20530
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-12-181COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against U.S. Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11959469.). Filed byGiffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 12/18/2017) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-182Proposed Summons. (Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 12/18/2017) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-18Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: 1 Complaint, filed by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Please resubmit the civil cover sheet for the Northern District of California from our website at www.cand.uscourts.gov (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-183Civil Cover Sheet by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence (Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) . (Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 12/18/2017) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-194Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2018-01-025CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence.. (Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 1/2/2018) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-026Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2018) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-037Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
2018-01-038***erroneous docket entry*** (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018) Modified on 1/4/2018 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-02-089CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Deborah Won)(Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 2/8/2018) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-1310MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12107775.) filed by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Thurston, Robin) (Filed on 2/13/2018) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-2211STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 2/22/2018) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-02-2612ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Robin Thurston. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-03-0113CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Department of Justice.. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 3/1/2018) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-0114STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 3/1/2018) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-0115ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 3/1/2018) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-0116NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Joint) (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 3/1/2018) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-0217ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 14 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and exempt parties from Rule 26 Requirements. Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-03-0518ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Department of Justice. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 3/5/2018) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-0619ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Monday, April 2, 2018, at 10:00 AM Pacific time (1:00 PM Eastern). Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-0720ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Thurston, Robin) (Filed on 3/7/2018) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-04-0221ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 4/2/2018 by Howard Herman. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-0222*** Disregard. Duplicate entry. *** ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 4/2/2018 by Howard Herman. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Modified on 4/2/2018 (af, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-0523STATUS REPORT (Joint) and Request to Continue Case Management Conference by U.S. Department of Justice. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 4/5/2018) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-0624ORDER re: Status Report. Initial Case Management Conference Continued, now set for 8/23/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor.Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/6/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-08-1625STATUS REPORT and Request to Continue CMC by U.S. Department of Justice. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 8/16/2018) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-1626ORDER GRANTING 25 request to continue CMC and related deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/16/2018. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-16Set/Reset Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-0427ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-04Case reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Thomas S Hixson. Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-2428STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Pamela T. Johann)(Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 9/24/2018) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-2429ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 28 Stipulation to continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar